blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2751991


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.05.2019 (Expected) grant published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
08.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.05.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
12.03.2019 Change - representative
25.02.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.02.2019 Change - German title published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Change - classification published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
15.02.2019 Change - classification published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
15.02.2019 Change - German title published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
15.02.2019 Change - French title published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
01.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
22.10.2014 Amendment by applicant
03.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
06.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
09.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.04.2014 Amendment by applicant
29.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
25.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication