blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2751991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013041121Global Dossier 28.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP66237 19.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9143728Global Dossier 22.09.2015B2
US2014218464 07.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP66237 19.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2751991Global Dossier 12.06.2019B1
EP2751991 09.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP66237 19.09.2011