Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2611449

EP2611449 - ADMINISTRATION OF LORCASERIN TO INDIVIDUALS WITH RENAL IMPAIRMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.06.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
6154 Nancy Ridge Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2013/28]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSON, Christen M.
756 Poinsettia Park South
Encinitas California 92024 / US
02 / SHANAHAN, William R.
4948 Rancho Viejo Drive
Del Mar California 92014 / US
 [2013/28]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/28]Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date11758012.631.08.2011
WO2011US49936
Priority number, dateUS20100403149P10.09.2010         Original published format: US 403149 P
US20100402628P01.09.2010         Original published format: US 402628 P
[2013/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012030939
Date:08.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2611449
Date:10.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012
[2013/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/55, A61P3/04
[2013/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/28]
Extension statesBA28.03.2013
ME28.03.2013
TitleGerman:VERABREICHUNG VON LORCASERIN AN PERSONEN MIT NIERENERKRANKUNGEN[2013/28]
English:ADMINISTRATION OF LORCASERIN TO INDIVIDUALS WITH RENAL IMPAIRMENT[2013/28]
French:ADMINISTRATION DE LORCASÉRINE À DES INDIVIDUS PRÉSENTANT UNE INSUFFISANCE RÉNALE[2013/28]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2013National basic fee paid 
28.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/28]
24.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination02.10.2015Appeal received No.  T0018/16
02.12.2015Statement of grounds filed
09.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP15169002.1  / EP2939677
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006071740  (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-51 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 2, line 24 - line 26 * * "Summary of the Invention"; page 3 * * page 6, line 26 - page 8, line 15 * * page 9, line 14 - line 18 * * page 9, line 14 - line 29 * * page 25, line 11 - page 28, line 26 * * examples 58-60 * * Claims *;
 [XI]  - Christen Anderson / Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc, "Pharmacokinetik Properties of Lorcaserin in Subjects With Renal Impairment", (20090727), URL: http://www.clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/NCT00828438?term=lorcaserin&rank=8 clinical trial, (20111025), XP055010366 [X] 1-38,42,43,49-51 * the whole document * [I] 39-41,44-48
 [XI]  - Y. WANG ET AL, "Lorcaserin hydrochloride", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (20070101), vol. 32, no. 9, doi:10.1358/dof.2007.032.09.1135518, ISSN 0377-8282, page 766, XP055010380 [X] 1-38,42,43,49-51 * in particular * * "Preclinical Pharmacology" "Pharmacokinetics and Metabolism" "Safety" "Clinical Studies" * [I] 39-41,44-48

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2007.032.09.1135518
 [XPI]  - YU WANG ET AL, "The use of lorcaserin in the management of obesity: a critical appraisal", DRUG DESIGN, DEVELOPMENT AND THERAPY, (20101201), doi:10.2147/DDDT.S11945, ISSN 1177-8881, page 1, XP055010149 [XP] 1-38,42,43,49-51 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 3, column 2, line 29 - line 32 * [I] 39-41,44-48

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/DDDT.S11945
by applicantWO03086303
 WO2005019179
 WO2006069363
 WO2007120517
 WO2008070111
 WO2009111004
 WO2006071740
    - SEIDELL, SEMIN VASC MED, (2005), vol. 5, pages 3 - 14
    - PERRY, I. J. ET AL., BMJ, (1995), vol. 310, pages 560 - 564
    - "Generation of Polymorphs, Hydrates, Solvates, and Amorphous Solids", K.J. GUILLORY, Polymorphism in Pharmaceutical Solids, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1999), vol. 95, pages 202 - 209
    - LAMEIRE ET AL., AM J. OF CARDIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 98, pages 21 K - 26K
    - J. OF CARDIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 98, pages 21K - 26K
    - SCHWARTZ, FURTH, PEDIATR NEPHROL, (2007), vol. 22, pages 1839 - 1848
    - TRAYNOR ET AL., BMJ, (2006), vol. 33, pages 733 - 737
    - DELANAYE ET AL., NEPHROL. DIAL. TRANSPLANT, (2005), vol. 20, pages 2024 - 2028
 US20100402578
 US20100403143
 US20100402580
 US20100403149
 US20100402589
 US20100402611
 US20100402565
 US20100403185