Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2613780

EP2613780 - METHODS FOR CONCOMITANT TREATMENT OF THEOPHYLLINE AND FEBUXOSTAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
One Takeda Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
[2013/29]
Inventor(s)01 / GUNAWARDHANA, Lhanoo
10143 48th Avenue
Pleasant Prairie, Wisconsin 53158 / US
02 / NAIK, Himanshu
1675 Church Street
Evanston, IL 60201 / US
03 / TSAI, Max
1780 Sunset Road
Highland Park, IL 60035 / US
 [2014/21]
Former [2013/29]01 / GUNAWARDHANA, Lhanoo
10143 48th Avenue
Pleasant Prairie Wisconsin 53158 / US
02 / NAIK, Himanshu
1675 Church Street
Evanston IL 60201 / US
03 / TSAI, Max
1780 Sunset Road
Highland Park IL 60035 / US
Representative(s)Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
[N/P]
Former [2013/29]Simpson, Verena
Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
Application number, filing date11758053.008.09.2011
WO2011US50870
Priority number, dateUS20100381482P10.09.2010         Original published format: US 381482 P
[2013/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012033941
Date:15.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2613780
Date:17.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2012
[2013/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2613780
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/415, A61K31/426, A61K45/06, A61P11/06, A61P19/06, A61K31/522
[2013/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DIE GLEICHZEITIGE BEHANDLUNG MIT THEOPHYLLIN UND FEBUXOSTAT[2014/19]
English:METHODS FOR CONCOMITANT TREATMENT OF THEOPHYLLINE AND FEBUXOSTAT[2013/29]
French:MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT SIMULTANÉ À BASE DE THÉOPHYLLINE ET DE FÉBUXOSTAT[2013/29]
Former [2013/29]VERFAHREN FÜR KONKOMITANTE BEHANDLUNG MIT THEOPHYLLIN UND FEBUXOSTAT
Entry into regional phase08.04.2013National basic fee paid 
08.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/29]
07.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
17.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2014Observations by third parties
24.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2014Fee for grant paid
25.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.02.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015  07.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.08.2015  18.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 03  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 04  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  WITHDRAWN
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 05  12.08.2015  17.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Opponent's representative
FRKelly, et al
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 06  12.08.2015  19.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories (UK) Limited/ betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
6 Riverview Road/ Kobelweg 95
Beverley/Augsburg
East Yorkshire HU17 0LD GB/86156 DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/38]
Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015  07.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.08.2015  18.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 03  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 04  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  WITHDRAWN
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 05  12.08.2015  17.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Opponent's representative
FRKelly, et al
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 06  12.08.2015  19.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories (UK) Limited/ betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
6 Riverview Road/ Kobelweg 95
Beverley/Augsburg
East Yorkshire HU17 0LD GB/86156 DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2017/36]
Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015  07.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.08.2015  18.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 03  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 04  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 05  12.08.2015  17.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Opponent's representative
FRKelly, et al
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 06  12.08.2015  19.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories (UK) Limited/ betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
6 Riverview Road/ Kobelweg 95
Beverley/Augsburg
East Yorkshire HU17 0LD GB/86156 DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2016/25]
Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015  07.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.08.2015  18.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 03  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 04  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 05  12.08.2015  17.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Opponent's representative
Kelly, Donal Morgan, et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
 06  12.08.2015  19.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories (UK) Limited/ betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
6 Riverview Road/ Kobelweg 95
Beverley/Augsburg
East Yorkshire HU17 0LD GB/86156 DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015  07.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.08.2015  18.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 03  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 04  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
34 Lovedon Lane
Winchester
Hampshire SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 05  12.08.2015  17.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Opponent's representative
Kelly, Donal Morgan, et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
 06  12.08.2015  19.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories (UK) Limited/ betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
6 Riverview Road/ Kobelweg 95
Beverley/Augsburg
East Yorkshire HU17 0LD GB/86156 DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2015/39]
Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015  07.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.08.2015  18.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 03  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 04  11.08.2015  14.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
34 Lovedon Lane
Winchester
Hampshire SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 05  12.08.2015  17.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Opponent's representative
Kelly, Donal Morgan, et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
 06  12.08.2015  19.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories (UK) Limited/ betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
6 Riverview Road/ Kobelweg 95
Beverley/Augsburg
East Yorkshire HU17 0LD GB/86156 DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2015/38]
Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015  07.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.08.2015   
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 03  11.08.2015   
Actavis PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 04  11.08.2015   
Strawman Limited
34 Lovedon Lane
Winchester
Hampshire SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 05  12.08.2015   
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Opponent's representative
Kelly, Donal Morgan, et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
18.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition05.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1597/17
04.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.09.2011
AL12.11.2014
AT12.11.2014
BE12.11.2014
BG12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
MK12.11.2014
MT12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
SM12.11.2014
TR12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
IE08.09.2015
LU08.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU08.09.2011
AT12.11.2014
BE12.11.2014
BG12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
MK12.11.2014
MT12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
SM12.11.2014
TR12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
IE08.09.2015
LU08.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2017/48]HU08.09.2011
AT12.11.2014
BE12.11.2014
BG12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
MT12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
SM12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
IE08.09.2015
LU08.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2017/39]HU08.09.2011
AT12.11.2014
BG12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
MT12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
SM12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
IE08.09.2015
LU08.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2017/22]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
MT12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
IE08.09.2015
LU08.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/33]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
IE08.09.2015
LU08.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/23]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
LU08.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
LU08.09.2015
Former [2016/12]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SI12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/37]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
SK12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/36]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
CZ12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RO12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/35]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
EE12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/26]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/25]AT12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/24]FI12.11.2014
HR12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
LV12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
PL12.11.2014
RS12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
GR13.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI12.11.2014
LT12.11.2014
NL12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
IS12.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT12.11.2014
NO12.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT12.11.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2008089296  (TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS [US], et al) [X] 10-23 * claims 10-19 *;
 [X]WO2007019153  (TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 10-20,23 * pages 50-56; example 4 *;
 [X]DE3112116  (MUNDIPHARMA GMBH [DE]) [X] 25,27,29,30 * the whole document * * page 6, paragraph 3 *;
 [XYI]  - DELORME N ET AL, "Interaction of allopurinol and theophylline", 19870101, (19870101), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 403 - 404, XP008145260 [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,13-15,17,18,23-27,29,30,35,36,38,39,44,45 * page 403, column l - page 404, column l, paragraph 1 * [Y] 6-9,31-34,40-43 [I] 3,28,37
 [Y]  - MUKOYOSHI M ET AL, "In vitro drug-drug interaction studies with febuxostat, a novel non-purine selective inhibitor of xanthine oxidase: Plasma protein binding, identification of metabolic enzymes and cytochrome P450 inhibition", XENOBIOTICA, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS, LONDON, GB, (20080501), vol. 38, no. 5, doi:10.1080/00498250801956350, ISSN 0049-8254, pages 496 - 510, XP008145259 [Y] 6-9,31-34,40-43 * the whole document * * page 506, paragraph l - page 507, paragraph 1 * * page 509 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00498250801956350
by applicantUS5268386
 EP0415566
 US5614520
 US6225474
 US7074816
    - MANFREDI BA ET AL., CLIN. PHARMACOL. THER., (1981), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 224 - 229
    - YASUHIRO TAKANO ET AL., LIFE SCIENCES, (2005), vol. 76, pages 1835 - 1847
    - ISHIBUCHI, S. ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2001), vol. 11, pages 879 - 882
    - UEMATSU T. ET AL., "Pharmacokinetic and Pharmacodynamic Properties of a Novel Xanthine Oxidase Inhibitor, BOF-4272, in Healthy Volunteers", J. PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (199408), vol. 270, pages 453 - 459
    - "A Novel Xanthine Deydrogenase Inhibitor (BOF-4272", SATO, S., Purine and Pyrimidine Metabolism in Man, PLENUM PRESS, vol. VII, pages 135 - 138
    - BERGE ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19
    - MELETHIL S ET AL., RES COMMUN CHEM PATHOL PHARMACOL., (1982), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 341 - 4
 US19820613814