blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2550819


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.01.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
24.10.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.05.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
27.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.10.2014 Change - Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
18.07.2014 Change - applicant published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
04.07.2014 Change - representative published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
26.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.08.2013 Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution published on  02.10.2013  [2013/40]
31.05.2013 Change - extension states published on  03.07.2013  [2013/27]
29.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.12.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.01.2013  [2013/05]
28.12.2012 Request for examination filed published on  30.01.2013  [2013/05]
30.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
26.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
08.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication