blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2550819 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201010132767 EP11758889



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013012224Global Dossier 10.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201010132767 25.03.2010
WO2011IB00929 25.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20120139835Global Dossier 27.12.2012A
Priority number Date
CN201010132767 25.03.2010
WO2011IB00929 25.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2013524565Global Dossier 17.06.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201010132767 25.03.2010
WO2011IB00929 25.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2550819Global Dossier 30.01.2013A2
Priority number Date
CN201010132767 25.03.2010
WO2011IB00929 25.03.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011117729Global Dossier 22.12.2011A3
WO2011117729 29.09.2011A2
Priority number Date
CN201010132767 25.03.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN102202310Global Dossier 28.09.2011A
Priority number Date
CN201010132767 25.03.2010