blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2550819

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure25.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/09]
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2012National basic fee paid 
25.10.2012Search fee paid 
25.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201606   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:30.01.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20121025
 
Event date:30.01.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:03.07.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:02.10.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON OTHER RIGHTS AND LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION
Free Format Text:AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Effective DATE:20130410
 
Event date:20.08.2014 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:ALCATEL LUCENT
 
Event date:19.11.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON OTHER RIGHTS AND LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION (DELETED)
 
Event date:01.03.2017 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20161001