Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2550819

EP2550819 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REDUCING INTERFERENCE AMONG FEMTOCELLS IN AN ACCESS DEVICE OF A FEMTOCELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.03.2017  [2017/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2014/34]
Former [2013/05]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Feng
388 Ningqiao RD
Shanghai
Shanghai 201206 / CN
02 / QIU, Jigang
388 Ningqiao RD
Shanghai
Shanghai 201206 / CN
 [2013/05]
Representative(s)2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 15 17 23
80050 München / DE
[2014/32]
Former [2013/05]Schuler, Jürgen
2SPL Patentanwälte
Postfach 15 17 23
80050 München / DE
Application number, filing date11758889.725.03.2011
WO2011IB00929
Priority number, dateCN2010113276725.03.2010         Original published format: CN201010132767
[2013/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011117729
Date:29.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2550819
Date:30.01.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011
[2013/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN22.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/10, H04W16/14, H04W16/18, H04W48/02
[2013/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNG ZWISCHEN FEMTOZELLEN IN EINER ZUGANGSVORRICHTUNG EINER FEMTOZELLE[2013/05]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REDUCING INTERFERENCE AMONG FEMTOCELLS IN AN ACCESS DEVICE OF A FEMTOCELL[2013/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR RÉDUIRE LE BROUILLAGE ENTRE DES FEMTOCELLULES DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS D'UNE FEMTOCELLULE[2013/05]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2012National basic fee paid 
25.10.2012Search fee paid 
25.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/05]
01.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/09]
25.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201606   M06   Not yet paid
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2014/47]
Former [2013/40]ID:01
For:AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Date:10.04.2013
[2014/47]
Cited inInternational search[X]CN101420746  (ZTE CORP [CN]);
 [A]CN1694557  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]);
 [A]CN101133675  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI])