Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2656023

EP2656023 - LOOP-POWERED FIELD DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.07.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rosemount Tank Radar AB
Box 13045
402 51 Göteborg / SE
[2014/47]
Former [2013/44]For all designated states
Rosemount Tank Radar AB
Box 13045
402 51 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NILSSON, Valter
Järkholmen 610
S-436 56 Hovås / SE
 [2013/44]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/14]Kransell & Wennborg KB , et al
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
Former [2013/44]Edlund, Fabian , et al
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 11 394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date11761032.905.09.2011
WO2011EP65329
Priority number, dateUS2010097612522.12.2010         Original published format: US 976125
[2013/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012084280
Date:28.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2656023
Date:30.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012
[2013/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2656023
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/284
[2013/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:REGELKREISBETRIEBENES FELDGERÄT[2013/44]
English:LOOP-POWERED FIELD DEVICE[2013/44]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TERRAIN ALIMENTÉ PAR BOUCLE[2013/44]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2013National basic fee paid 
15.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/44]
07.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2014Fee for grant paid
07.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.05.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.08.2015  20.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG
PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
 [2015/39]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.04.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.07.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition14.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1819/17
17.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.09.2011
AL19.11.2014
AT19.11.2014
BE19.11.2014
BG19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
MK19.11.2014
MT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
SM19.11.2014
TR19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
GB05.09.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU05.09.2011
AT19.11.2014
BE19.11.2014
BG19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
MK19.11.2014
MT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
SM19.11.2014
TR19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
GB05.09.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
Former [2017/48]HU05.09.2011
AT19.11.2014
BE19.11.2014
BG19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
MT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
SM19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
GB05.09.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
Former [2017/39]HU05.09.2011
AT19.11.2014
BG19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
MT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
SM19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
GB05.09.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
Former [2017/22]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
MT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
GB05.09.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
Former [2016/36]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
GB05.09.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
Former [2016/34]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
GB05.09.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/33]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/23]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/12]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2016/03]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/37]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/36]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/35]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/26]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/25]AT19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/24]ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RS19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/23]ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT19.11.2014
Cited inInternational search[I]US6680690  (NILSSON VALTER [SE] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0065] *;
 [I]US2010123614  (NILSSON LEIF [SE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO0244748  (MCEWAN TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]; MCEWAN THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4849754  (MALTBY FREDERICK L [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *