Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2536197

EP2536197 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REPORTING NEIGHBOR CELL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.01.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2012/51]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / GAO, Yin
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / HAN, Lifeng
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2012/51]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Zerbi, Guido Maria , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Piazza Borromeo, 12
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2012/51]Mercer, Daniel John
Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date11761953.615.03.2011
WO2011CN71809
Priority number, dateCN20101014059529.03.2010         Original published format: CN201010140595
[2012/51]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011120379
Date:06.10.2011
Language:ZH
[2011/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2536197
Date:19.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN06.10.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10, // H04W36/00, H04W36/08, H04W48/16
[2014/10]
Former International [2012/51]H04W24/02, H04W24/08, H04W36/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR MELDUNG VON NACHBARZELLENINFORMATIONEN[2012/51]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REPORTING NEIGHBOR CELL INFORMATION[2012/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RAPPORT D'INFORMATIONS DE CELLULES VOISINES[2012/51]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2012Translation filed 
14.09.2012National basic fee paid 
14.09.2012Search fee paid 
14.09.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/51]
07.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination28.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0553/16
22.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009005029  (WANG JIN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * claims 1,2 *
 [XY]  - 3GPP TR 36.805 V9.0.0 (2009-12), "3GPP TR 36.805 V9.0.0 (2009-12); 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Study on Minimization of drive-tests in Next Generation Networks; (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 36.805, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091221), no. V9.0.0, pages 1 - 24, XP050401520 [X] 1-3,7-11 * page 5, "1 Scope"; page 6, "4 Requirements and constraints"; page 7, "5.1 Use cases - Coverage optimization"; page 10, "6.1 UE measurement logging" and "6.1.1 Periodical downlink pilot measurements"; page 11, "6.1.2 Serving Cell becomes worse than threshold"; pages 18 and 19, "7.1.1 UE memory impact"; page 19, "8 Conclusion" * [Y] 4-6
 [XA]  - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "3GPP TSG-RAN #68bis; R2-100472; MDT requirements and expected Stage 2/3 work", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-100469, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100112), vol. RAN WG2, no. Valencia, Spain; 20100118, pages 1 - 3, XP050421105 [X] 1-3,7-11 * page 1, "2. Principles to be kept in mind from the SI", "UE measurement configuration" * [A] 4-6
 [Y]  - 3GPP TS 36.331 V9.1.0 (2009-12), "3GPP TS 36.331 V9.1.0 (2009-12); 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.331, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100107), no. V9.1.0, pages 1 - 221, XP050401822 [Y] 4-6 * page 59,5.5.1 Introduction"; page 68, "5.5.4.3 Event A2"; page 69, "5.5.4.3 Event A4"; page 71, "5.5.5 Measurement reporting"; pages 165-167, "ReportConfigEUTRA" *
 [XP]  - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "3GPP TSG-RAN2 #77bis; R2-121542; Reporting Triggers for Immediate MDT", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-121542_REPORTING TRIGGERS FOR IMM MDT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120320), vol. RAN WG2, no. Jeju, South Korea; 20120326 - 20120330, pages 1 - 3, XP050606344 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN1434595  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD);
 [XP]CN101888652  (BEIJING DINGHAN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD)
 [Y]  - ERICSSON, "Logged MDT measurement reporting", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING #69, TDOC R2-101425, (20100226), XP050421822