Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2553638

EP2553638 - MANAGING COMMITTED REQUEST RATES FOR SHARED RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amazon Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 8102
Reno, NV 89507 / US
[2018/29]
Former [2013/06]For all designated states
Amazon Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 8102
Reno, NV 89507 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CERTAIN, Tate, Andrew
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
02 / PATERSON-JONES, Roland
1200 12th Avenue South, Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
03 / HAMILTON, James, R.
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
04 / JAIN, Sachin
1200 12th Avenue South, Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
05 / GARMAN, Matthew, S.
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
06 / SUNDERLAND, David, N.
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
07 / WEI, Danny
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
08 / CATTANEO, Fiorenzo
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2018/29]
Former [2013/06]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11763335.429.03.2011
[2018/29]
WO2011US30389
Priority number, dateUS2010074944929.03.2010         Original published format: US 749449
US2010074945129.03.2010         Original published format: US 749451
[2013/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011123467
Date:06.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2553638
Date:06.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011
[2013/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2553638
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.10.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04L12/911, H04L12/923
[2018/04]
Former International [2014/16]G06Q10/00, G06Q10/06
Former International [2013/06]G06Q10/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWALTUNG DER FREQUENZ DURCHGEFÜHRTER ABFRAGEN FÜR GEMEINSAM GENUTZTE RESSOURCEN[2013/06]
English:MANAGING COMMITTED REQUEST RATES FOR SHARED RESOURCES[2013/06]
French:GESTION DES DÉBITS DE DEMANDE GARANTIS POUR DES RESSOURCES PARTAGÉES[2013/06]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2012National basic fee paid 
29.10.2012Search fee paid 
29.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/06]
13.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.06.2018Fee for grant paid
09.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.09.2016
Opposition(s)23.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
LU29.03.2019
[2020/01]
Former [2019/46]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/37]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/23]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
NO18.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL18.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006153090  (BISHOP ELLIS E [US] ET AL BISHOP ELLIS EDWARD [US] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [I]US7054943  (GOLDSZMIDT GERMAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * abstract *
International search[Y]US2004107281  (BOSE PRATIK [US], et al);
 [Y]US2003028642  (AGARWAL VIKAS [IN], et al)
by applicantUS2006153090
 US7054943
 US2004107281
 US2003028642