Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2563801

EP2563801 - SUBSTITUTION DERIVATIVES OF N6-BENZYLADENOSINE-5 ́-MONOPHOSPHATE, METHODS OF PREPARATION THEREOF, USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS, AND THERAPEUTIC PREPARATION CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.07.2015
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, HU, SM, TR
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
BioApex, s.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
[2014/39]
Former [2013/10]For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Bio Apex S.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / ZATLOUKAL, Marek
Revolucni 18a
787 01 Sumperk / CZ
02 / DOLEZAL, Karel
Posluchov 31
783 65 Hlubocky / CZ
03 / VOLLER, Jiri
Pristavni 10B
625 00 Brno / CZ
04 / SPICHAL, Lukas
Tr. Svornosti 14
772 00 Olomouc / CZ
05 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
 [2013/10]
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina
Inventia s.r.o.
Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2013/10]
Application number, filing date11763831.228.04.2011
WO2011CZ00044
Priority number, dateCZ2010000033229.04.2010         Original published format: CZ 20100332
[2013/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011134444
Date:03.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2563801
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011
[2013/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2563801
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search reportEP22.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/167, A61K31/7076, A61P35/00
[2013/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUTIONSDERIVATE DES N6-BENZYLADENOSIN-5'-MONOPHOSPHATS, DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSMETHODEN, VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENT UND THERAPEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE DIESE VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTEN[2014/28]
English:SUBSTITUTION DERIVATIVES OF N6-BENZYLADENOSINE-5 ́-MONOPHOSPHATE, METHODS OF PREPARATION THEREOF, USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS, AND THERAPEUTIC PREPARATION CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS[2013/10]
French:DÉRIVÉS PAR SUBSTITUTION DE N6-BENZYLADÉNOSINE-5'-MONOPHOSPHATE, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION, LEUR UTILISATION COMME MÉDICAMENTS ET PRÉPARATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES CONTENANT CES COMPOSÉS[2013/10]
Former [2013/10]SUBSTITUTION-DERIVATE VON N6-BENZYLADENOSINE -5 'MONO-PHOSPHAT, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, VERWENDUNG DAVON ALS ARZNEIMITTEL, UND THERAPEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNG, DIE DIESE VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTEN
Entry into regional phase30.10.2012National basic fee paid 
30.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/10]
30.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2014Fee for grant paid
29.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.02.2014
Opposition(s)25.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.04.2011
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
[2017/38]
Former [2017/03]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2016/12]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT24.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2004058791  (USTAV EX BOTAN AKADEMIE VED CE [CZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - IMAHORI, KAZUTOMO ET AL, "Purine nucleotides", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 87:136321, URL: STN, XP002661696 [X] 1 * compound 63456-71-2 and 63425-98-9 *
 [XP]  - VOLLER J ET AL, "Anticancer activity of natural cytokinins: A structure-activity relationship study", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, vol. 71, no. 11-12, ISSN 0031-9422, (20100801), pages 1350 - 1359, (20100601), XP027114119 [XP] 1,2,5,11 * compound oTRMP *
 [X]  - MARIYANA IVANOVA ET AL, "Endogenous cytokinins in shoots of Aloe polyphylla cultured in vitro in relation to hyperhydricity, exogenous cytokinins and gelling agents", PLANT GROWTH REGULATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20061020), vol. 50, no. 2-3, doi:10.1007/S10725-006-9139-X, ISSN 1573-5087, pages 219 - 230, XP019449579 [X] 1,2 * compound mTRMP *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10725-006-9139-x
 [X]  - SAKAI K ET AL, "AFFINITY LABELING OF THE ALLOSTERIC SITE OF FRUCTOSE 1,6-BISPHOSPHATASE WITH AN AMP ANALOG", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPANESE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY / OUP, TOKYO; JP, (19870101), vol. 102, no. 2, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 377 - 384, XP001063936 [X] 1,2 * page 378 *
by applicantCZ294538
    - SKOOG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1965), vol. 148, pages 532 - 533,
    - HORGAN ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1975), vol. 14, pages 1005 - 1008,
    - STRNAD, PHYSIOL. PLANT., (1997), vol. 101, pages 674 - 688,
    - STRNAD ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 99, pages 74 - 80,
    - HEWETT ET AL., PLANTA, (1973), vol. 114, pages 119 - 129,
    - BERGE ET AL., ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (2006), vol. 1067, pages 332 - 336,
    - ISHII ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2003), vol. 1643, pages 11 - 24,
    - MLEJNEK, J.CELL BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 83, pages 678 - 689,
    - ISHII ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2002), vol. 1643, pages 11 - 24,
    - TIEDEMANN ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2008), vol. 118, pages 1750 - 1764,
    - CABELO ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2008), vol. 120, pages 2744 - 2748,
    - CHOI ET AL., CANCER LETT., (2008), vol. 261, pages 37 - 45,
    - LAEZZA ET AL., INT. J. CANCER., (2009), vol. 124, pages 1322 - 1329,
    - MEISEL ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1998), vol. 433, pages 265 - 268,
    - SPINOLA ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2007), vol. 120, pages 2744 - 2748,
    - LAEZZA ET AL., FASEB J., (2006), vol. 20, pages 412 - 418,
    - MITTELMAN ET AL., ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1975), vol. 255, pages 225 - 234,
    - MLEJNEK, PROCHAZKA, PLANTA, (2002), vol. 215, pages 158 - 166,
    - CARIMI ET AL., PLANTA, (2003), vol. 216, pages 413 - 421,
    - MLEJNEK ET AL., PLANT. CELL. ENVIRON., (2003), vol. 26, pages 1723 - 1735,
    - PLANT. SCI., (2005), vol. 168, pages 389 - 395,
    - DOLE2AL ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 14, pages 875 - 884,
    - BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 15, pages 3737 - 3747,
    - GURVICH ET AL., NUCLEOS.NUCLEOT., (1999), vol. 18, page 2327,
    - MLEJNEK, KOLMAN, CHEM. BIOL. INTERACT., (1999), vol. 117, pages 219 - 239,
    - MLEJNEK, KUGLIK, J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 77, pages 6 - 17,