blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2554599

EP2554599 - POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND MOLDED ARTICLE OF THIS RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2024New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
[2023/43]
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
For all designated states
Mitsubishi Engineering-Plastics Corporation
9-2, Higashishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0021 / JP
Former [2013/06]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
For all designated states
Mitsubishi Engineering-Plastics Corporation
9-2, Higashishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0021 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HITOMI, Tatsuya
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi
Fukuoka / JP
02 / NISHIHARA, Ryouhei
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi
Fukuoka / JP
03 / YAMAMOTO, Masanori
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi
Fukuoka / JP
04 / NAKATA, Michio
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi
Fukuoka / JP
05 / NOBUYASU, Tetsurou
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi
Fukuoka / JP
06 / UCHIMURA, Ryuuji
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi
Fukuoka / JP
07 / TAKAHASHI, Kazuyuki
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi
Fukuoka / JP
08 / TSURUHARA, Kenji
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi
Fukuoka / JP
09 / YOKOYAMA, Tomonari
c/o Mitsubishi Engineering-Plastics Corporation
6-2, Higashiyawata 5-chome, Hiratsuka-shi
Kanagawa / JP
 [2013/07]
Former [2013/06]01 / HITOMI, Tatsuya
/ JP
02 / NISHIHARA, Ryouhei
/ JP
03 / YAMAMOTO, Masanori
/ JP
04 / NAKATA, Michio
/ JP
05 / NOBUYASU, Tetsurou
/ JP
06 / UCHIMURA, Ryuuji
/ JP
07 / TAKAHASHI, Kazuyuki
/ JP
08 / TSURUHARA, Kenji
/ JP
09 / YOKOYAMA, Tomonari
/ JP
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2017/46]
Former [2013/20]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Me/bk
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2013/06]TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Me/bk
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date11765803.931.03.2011
[2017/46]
WO2011JP58336
Priority number, dateJP2010026205625.11.2010         Original published format: JP 2010262056
JP2010026205525.11.2010         Original published format: JP 2010262055
JP2010008318131.03.2010         Original published format: JP 2010083181
[2013/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011125903
Date:13.10.2011
Language:JA
[2011/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2554599
Date:06.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2554599
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.10.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2013
ClassificationIPC:C08L69/00, C08K3/32, C08K5/02, C08K5/42, C08K5/49, B29K69/00, C08K3/00, B29C45/00, B29C47/00, B29B9/06, B29B9/12, B29B7/46
[2017/26]
CPC:
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US); B29B7/46 (US); B29B9/06 (US);
B29B9/12 (US); B29C45/0001 (US); B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (US); B32B5/145 (US); C08K3/32 (KR);
C08K5/02 (KR); C08K5/42 (KR); B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29K2069/00 (EP); B29K2105/0067 (US); B29K2105/0094 (US);
B29K2995/002 (US); B29K2995/0046 (US); B29K2995/007 (US);
B29K2995/0088 (US); B29K2995/0089 (US); B29L2007/002 (US);
B29L2007/008 (US); C08K3/016 (EP,US); C08L2205/02 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L69/00, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L69/00, C08L2205/02 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2013/38]C08L69/00, C08K3/32, C08K5/02, C08K5/42, C08K5/49, B29K69/00, C08K3/00
Former IPC [2013/06]C08L69/00, C08K3/32, C08K5/02, C08K5/42, C08K5/49
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYCARBONATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND FORMARTIKEL AUS DIESER HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2013/06]
English:POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND MOLDED ARTICLE OF THIS RESIN COMPOSITION[2013/06]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINES DE POLYCARBONATE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET ARTICLE MOULÉ À BASE DE CETTE COMPOSITION DE RÉSINES[2013/06]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2012Translation filed 
31.10.2012National basic fee paid 
31.10.2012Search fee paid 
31.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/06]
27.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2017Fee for grant paid
05.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.09.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.08.2018  15.08.2018  ADMISSIBLE
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Gabriella Diana
Modiano & Partners (DE)
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
 [2018/38]
04.01.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.05.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.07.2020Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2020
16.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
15.06.2021Date of oral proceedings
02.08.2021Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.08.2021Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.01.2024Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.04.2024Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Appeal following opposition12.10.2021Appeal received No.  T1813/21
12.10.2021Payment of appeal fee
13.12.2021Statement of grounds filed
24.01.2024Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
23.04.2024Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
24.01.2024Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.03.2011
AL15.11.2017
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
MK15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
PT15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
TR15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
IS15.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
GB31.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
MT31.03.2018
[2020/33]
Former [2020/31]HU31.03.2011
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
MK15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
PT15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
TR15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
GB31.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
MT31.03.2018
Former [2020/27]HU31.03.2011
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
PT15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
TR15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
GB31.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
MT31.03.2018
Former [2020/16]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
TR15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
GB31.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
MT31.03.2018
Former [2020/08]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
GB31.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
MT31.03.2018
Former [2019/23]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
GB31.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
Former [2019/12]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
GB31.03.2018
IE31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
Former [2019/09]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
IE31.03.2018
LU31.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU31.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003060575  (CARUSO ANDREW JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0201] - paragraph [0205]; examples 14, C1, 47; tables 1, 3 *;
 [A]WO2008002734  (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [A] 1-26* page 27, line 30 - page 32, line 2; examples Comp. Ex. 1, Comp. Ex. 2, 2; tables 1, 2 *;
 [A]US2008015291  (SIRIPURAPU SRINIVAS [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * examples 6, 7, 9; tables 1, 2, 3 *;
 [A]US2008254299  (BLACKBURN SAPNA [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0050]; examples B, C, D, E; table 1 *
International search[X]JP2003535948  (GENERAL ELECTRIC CO.);
 [X]US2008015289  (SIRIPURAPU SRINIVAS [US]);
 [A]WO2008018467  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al)
by applicantJP2010083181
 JP2010262055
 JP2010262056
 JP2011018525
 JP2011018526
 JP2011047877
 JP2011076450
OppositionJPS6462351
 JPS6469625
 US5804673
 US2008015291
 US2008015290
 US2008254299
 US2009176946
    - I. M. KALOGERAS et al., "Glass Transition Temperatures in Binary Polymer Blends", Journal of polymer Science : Part B: polymer Physics, (20090000), vol. 47, pages 80 - 95, XP055512436

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/polb.21616
    - Saechtling Kunststoff Taschenbuch, (20040000), vol. 29, page 19, 21, XP055512459
    - Y. W. KIM et al., "Molecular thermodynamic model of the glass transition temperature: dependence on molecular weight", Polym. Adv. Technol., (20080000), vol. 19, pages 944 - 946, XP055512464

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pat.1081
    - K. CHEAH et al., "STRUCTURE-PROPERTY RELATIONSHIPS OF BLENDS OF POLYCARBONATE", Polymer Engineering and Science, (20031100), vol. 43, no. 11, pages 1727 - 1739, XP001192609

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pen.10146
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.