Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2556227

EP2556227 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A STATE OF A SENSOR IN THE EXHAUST SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scania CV AB
151 87 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [2013/07]For all designated states
Scania CV AB
151 87 Södertälje / SE
Inventor(s)01 / LUNDSTRÖM, Mikael
Tellusborgsvägen 108 4 tr
126 28 Hägersten / SE
02 / GRANBERG, Anders
Stenbrottsvägen 14
141 42 Huddinge / SE
 [2013/07]
Representative(s)Scania CV AB
Patents, GP 117kv
151 87 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [2013/32]Sjögren Paulsson, Stina , et al
Scania CV AB
Patent Department
151 87 Södertälje / SE
Former [2013/07]Waldebäck, Hans Olov
Scania CV AB Patents, TY
151 87 Södertälje / SE
Application number, filing date11766236.130.03.2011
WO2011SE50360
Priority number, dateSE2010005034308.04.2010         Original published format: SE 1050343
[2013/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011126429
Date:13.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2556227
Date:13.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011
[2013/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.10.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:F01N11/00, F02D41/14, F02D41/22
[2018/12]
Former International [2013/07]F01N11/00, F02D41/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/07]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG DES STATUS EINES SENSORS IM ABGASSYSTEM EINES MOTORFAHRZEUGS[2013/07]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A STATE OF A SENSOR IN THE EXHAUST SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE[2013/07]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'ETAT DE CAPTEUR DANS SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2013/07]
Entry into regional phase08.11.2012National basic fee paid 
08.11.2012Search fee paid 
08.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/07]
07.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009173140  (SUMITANI SHINYA [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,8-12,14,15,17-21 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1-5; claims 1-5 * [I] 7,16;
 [XI]FR2852395  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,6,9,15,18-21 * page 5, line 28 - page 8, line 6; figures 1,2 * [I] 2,3,7,10,11,14,16;
 [I]US2005103000  (NIEUWSTADT MICHIEL V [US] ET AL) [I] 1-3,9-11,14,18-21 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2-3; claim 27 *;
 [I]EP2119897  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]; DENSO CORP [JP]) [I] 1-3,6,7,9-11,15,16,18-21 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0082]; figures 2-5 *;
 [X]WO2009141918  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]; SAWADA HIROSHI [JP]; SHIBATA DAISUKE [JP]) [X] 1-3,9-11,14,18-21 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0100]; figures 1-8 *;
 [XP]EP2278144  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-3,9-11,14,18-21 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0100]; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US2009229356  (KARIYA YASUHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-5,9-14,18-21 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-6; claims 1-6 *;
 [XI]US2009013666  (JUNG JAE YOON [KR]) [X] 1-3,8-11,14,17-21 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-5; claims 1-6 * [I] 6,7,15,16;
 [X]JP2003120399  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11,15,16,18-21 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1-5 *;
 [I]WO0055614  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [I] 1-5,9-13,18-21 * page 3; figures 1,2 *
International search[X]US2009173140  (SUMITANI SHINYA [JP]);
 [A]US2003042151  (ANDO MASASHI [JP], et al);
 [A]EP2119897  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]US6453663  (ORZEL DANIEL V [US], et al);
 [A]DE10062289  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]US2005103000  (NIEUWSTADT MICHIEL V [US], et al)
by applicantWO2008120649
 JP2008133780
 US2009173140