Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2556474

EP2556474 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING PIN DEBIT TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CardinalCommerce Corporation
6119 Heisley Road
Mentor, OH 44060 / US
[2013/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KERESMAN, Michael, A., III
8890 Cardinal Drive
Kirtland Hills, OH 44060 / US
02 / TURGEON, Paul
2130 West Foster Avenue
Chicago, IL 60625 / US
 [2013/12]
Former [2013/07]01 / KERESMAN, Michael, A., III
8890 Cardinal Drive
Kirtland Hills, OH 44060 / US
02 / TURGEON, Paul
4830 North Hoyne Avenue Unit 1
Chicago, IL 60625-2901 / US
Representative(s)Hennicke, Ernst Rüdiger
Patentanwälte
Buschhoff Hennicke Althaus
Postfach 19 04 08
50501 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/07]Hennicke, Ernst Rüdiger
Patentanwälte Buschhoff Hennicke Althaus Postfach 19 04 08
50501 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date11766580.205.04.2011
WO2011US31210
Priority number, dateUS20100320868P05.04.2010         Original published format: US 320868 P
[2013/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011127029
Date:13.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2556474
Date:13.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011
[2013/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.10.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/00, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/38, G06Q30/06, G06Q20/02, G06Q20/24, G06Q20/26
[2013/49]
Former International [2013/07]G06Q20/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON PIN-KARTEN-TRANSAKTIONEN[2013/07]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING PIN DEBIT TRANSACTIONS[2013/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTIONS DE DÉBIT EN LIGNE (PIN)[2013/07]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2012National basic fee paid 
05.11.2012Search fee paid 
05.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/07]
03.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2016
06.10.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
04.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination03.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0617/17
15.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007192245  (FISHER DOUGLAS C [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * claims 2, 3, 18 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] - [0 22] - [0026] - [0 30] , [0 32] , [0 44] , [0 80] , [0 89] , [0 94] , [0 99] - [0113] - [ 118] * * paragraphs [0122] - [0126] - [ 161] - [0163] - [ 181] - [0189] - [ 201] - [0203] *
International search[X]US2009037982  (WENTKER DAVID [US], et al);
 [Y]US2009157518  (BISHOP FRED A [US], et al);
 [A]US2008275748  (JOHN MICHAEL SASHA [US])