Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2664192

EP2664192 - ROAMING CONTROL FOR IMS APN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2016/24]
Former [2013/47]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SANDER, Ann-Christine
Rörviksgatan 17
SE-421 65 Västra Frölunda / SE
02 / KELLER, Ralf
Talblick 22
52146 Würselen / DE
 [2013/47]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2016/24]
Former [2013/47]Vejgaard, Christian
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit GL
Lindholmspiren 11
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date11767006.707.10.2011
[2016/24]
WO2011EP67596
Priority number, dateUS201161432215P13.01.2011         Original published format: US 201161432215 P
[2013/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012095197
Date:19.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2664192
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2012
[2013/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2664192
Date:15.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/18, H04W8/06, // H04W76/00
[2015/32]
Former International [2015/04]H04W48/18, // H04W76/00
Former International [2013/47]H04W48/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROAMING-STEUERUNG FÜR IMS-APN[2013/47]
English:ROAMING CONTROL FOR IMS APN[2013/47]
French:COMMANDE D'ITINÉRANCE POUR IMS-APN[2015/04]
Former [2013/47]COMMANDE D'ITINÉRANCE POUR RÉSEAU APN D'UN SYSTÈME IMS
Entry into regional phase26.06.2013National basic fee paid 
26.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/47]
20.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2016Fee for grant paid
09.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2015
Opposition(s)16.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.10.2011
AL15.06.2016
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
BG15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
TR15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IE07.10.2016
LU07.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU07.10.2011
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
BG15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
TR15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IE07.10.2016
LU07.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/38]HU07.10.2011
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
BG15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IE07.10.2016
LU07.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU07.10.2011
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IE07.10.2016
LU07.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/28]HU07.10.2011
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IE07.10.2016
LU07.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/51]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IE07.10.2016
LU07.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/43]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
LU07.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/38]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2009047947  (GIARETTA GERARDO [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11,13-20,22-41 * paragraphs [0027] - [0062] *
 [XI]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; General Packet Radio Service (GPRS) enhancements for Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN) access (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.401, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110104), no. V10.2.1, pages 1 - 276, XP050462517 [X] 1,4,5,9-11,14,15,18,19,22,25,26,30-32,35,36,39,40 * tables 5.7.1-1,5.7.2-1 * * paragraphs [4.2.2] , [4.3.5.8] , [4.3.8.1] , [4.3.15] , [4.4.2] , [5.10.2] * [I] 2,3,6-8,13,16,17,20,23,24,27-29,33,34,37,38,41