Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2558044

EP2558044 - STIFFENER FOR USE WITH A DRUG PATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 16.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.06.2018  [2018/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syneron Medical Ltd.
P.O. Box 550
Yokneam Illit / IL
[2013/17]
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
Transpharma Medical, Ltd.
2 Yodfat Street Northern Industrial Zone
71291 Lod / IL
Inventor(s)01 / ARBEL, Giora
27 Hayedidut Street
P.O. Box 4443
40600 Tel Mond / IL
02 / BAR-EL, Yossi
536 Hazait Street
71947 Beit Arye / IL
 [2013/08]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]O'Neill, Brian
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date11768561.014.04.2011
WO2011IL00315
Priority number, dateUS20100324376P15.04.2010         Original published format: US 324376 P
[2013/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011128902
Date:20.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2558044
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011
[2013/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.03.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00, A61M35/00, A61K9/70, A61M37/00
[2017/40]
Former International [2013/08]A61F13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/08]
TitleGerman:VERSTEIFER ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM WIRKSTOFFPFLASTER[2013/08]
English:STIFFENER FOR USE WITH A DRUG PATCH[2013/08]
French:RAIDISSEUR DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ AVEC UN TIMBRE MÉDICAMENTEUX[2013/08]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2012National basic fee paid 
15.11.2012Search fee paid 
15.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/08]
21.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201404   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2014
30.04.201505   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2015
30.04.201707   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2009047774  (TRANSPHARMA LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5368581  (SMITH JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 3 - line 20 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2008274166  (SACKS HAGIT [IL], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2008274166  (SACKS HAGIT [IL], et al);
 [Y]US2004138603  (CLEARY GARY W [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006130675  (CRAWFORD DAVID S [US])