Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2559953

EP2559953 - HOT WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM AND HOT WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM OPERATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/08]CONTROLLER FOR WATER HEATER SYSTEM, PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING WATER HEATER SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING WATER HEATER SYSTEM
[2016/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2016/39]
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MAITANI, Hiroshi
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / FUJITSUKA, Masashi
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / KAWAGISHI, Motohiko
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / TAKAHASHI, Yoshihiro
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2013/08]
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E. , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[2016/39]
Former [2013/08]Sajda, Wolf E. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date11768769.907.04.2011
[2016/39]
WO2011JP58755
Priority number, dateJP2010009391915.04.2010         Original published format: JP 2010093919
[2013/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011129248
Date:20.10.2011
Language:JA
[2011/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2559953
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2559953
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.10.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F24D19/10, F24D11/02
[2013/51]
Former International [2013/08]F24H1/00, F24H1/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WARMWASSERVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM UND WARMWASSERVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM- BETRIEBSVERFAHREN[2016/41]
English:HOT WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM AND HOT WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM OPERATING METHOD[2016/41]
French:SYSTÈME D' ALIMENTATION D' EAU CHAUDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME D' ALIMENTATION D' EAU CHAUDE[2016/41]
Former [2013/08]STEUERGERÄT FÜR EIN WASSERERHITZERSYSTEM, PROGRAMM ZUR STEUERUNG DES WASSERERHITZERSYSTEMS UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR DAS WASSERERHITZERSYSTEM
Former [2013/08]CONTROLLER FOR WATER HEATER SYSTEM, PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING WATER HEATER SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING WATER HEATER SYSTEM
Former [2013/08]DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFE-EAU, PROGRAMME POUR COMMANDER UN SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFE-EAU, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFE-EAU
Entry into regional phase11.10.2012Translation filed 
11.10.2012National basic fee paid 
11.10.2012Search fee paid 
11.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/08]
10.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2016Fee for grant paid
22.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2015
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.04.2011
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE07.04.2017
LU07.04.2017
MT07.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/47]AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE07.04.2017
LU07.04.2017
MT07.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE07.04.2017
LU07.04.2017
MT07.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/23]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE07.04.2017
LU07.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU07.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/06]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/52]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1162419  (DENSO CORP [JP]; TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO [JP]; CENTRAL RES INST ELECT) [X] 1,2,12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,4a,4b *;
 [A]EP2009370  (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5052186  (DUDLEY KEVIN F [US] ET AL) [A] 1,12 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 68; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US2004144528  (KUNIMOTO KEIJIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0085] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JP2007198699  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2006343058  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010025494  (SANDEN CORP.);
 [A]JP2007278656  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2002243276