Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2769557 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2769557



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1123
16.03.2023 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.03.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 25
16.03.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
16.03.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
16.03.2023 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
03.03.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.03.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.03.2023 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
01.02.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 22
31.01.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
27.01.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.01.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.01.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.01.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 2
27.01.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 Appeal 3
27.01.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.01.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
26.01.2023 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
17.01.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
11.01.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.01.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.01.2023 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
05.12.2022 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
05.12.2022 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
05.04.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
05.04.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
05.04.2022 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 12
31.03.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.08.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Claims Appeal 2
10.08.2020 Claims Appeal 2
10.08.2020 Claims Appeal 3
10.08.2020 Claims Appeal 2
10.08.2020 Claims Appeal 2
10.08.2020 Claims Appeal 2
10.08.2020 Claims Appeal 2
10.08.2020 Claims Appeal 2
10.08.2020 Claims Appeal 2
10.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.08.2020 Reply to appeal Appeal 18
30.07.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
30.07.2020 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
30.07.2020 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
09.07.2020 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 3
29.04.2020 Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC Appeal 1
29.04.2020 Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC Appeal 1
02.04.2020 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.03.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.03.2020 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.03.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.03.2020 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
27.03.2020 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 38
27.03.2020 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
27.03.2020 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
27.03.2020 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 34
19.02.2020 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.02.2020 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.01.2020 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.11.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.11.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.11.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 15
18.11.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.11.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
18.11.2019 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.11.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.11.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
18.11.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.11.2019 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 10
18.11.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.11.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.09.2019 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 8
22.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
19.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 68
19.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 21
17.07.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2019 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2019 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2019 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
16.07.2019 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2019 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2019 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.07.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 18
16.07.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
11.07.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.10.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.10.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.10.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.09.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 19
27.09.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
27.09.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.08.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.08.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.08.2018 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
13.04.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.04.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.04.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 37
27.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 28
27.03.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 61
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
27.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.06.2017 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.05.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 16
06.02.2017 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 16
08.12.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.10.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.10.2016 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
23.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.07.2015 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 5
12.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.12.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
12.12.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
12.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
30.07.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.06.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
23.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
28.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
26.10.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.02.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.02.2012 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
22.12.2011 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 17
14.12.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 1
14.12.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
14.12.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 3
19.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
19.10.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
19.10.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
19.10.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 10
19.10.2011 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3