Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2627458

EP2627458 - A METHOD FOR CLASSIFYING SUGAR BEET SEEDS, COMPRISING THE USAGE OF INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.05.2018  [2018/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MariboHilleshög ApS
Højbygårdvej 31
4960 Holeby / DK
[2018/08]
Former [2013/34]For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FREDLUND, Bo, Kenneth, Michael
c/o Syngenta Seeds AB
Box 302
S-261 23 Landskrona / SE
02 / SANDER, Johan
c/o Syngenta Seeds AB
Box 302
S-261 23 Landskrona / SE
 [2013/34]
Representative(s)Inspicos P/S
Kogle Allé 2
2970 Hørsholm / DK
[N/P]
Former [2014/18]Syngenta International AG
WRO 1008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldalle 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2013/34]Scharrenberg, Christian
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date11771027.714.10.2011
WO2011EP05176
Priority number, dateEP2010001370815.10.2010         Original published format: EP 10013708
[2013/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012048897
Date:19.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2627458
Date:21.08.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012
[2013/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:B07C5/34, B07C5/342, G01N21/35, A01C1/02, G01N21/85
[2013/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KLASSIFIZIERUNG VON ZUCKERRÜBENSAMEN MITTELS INFRAROTSPEKTROSKOPIE[2013/34]
English:A METHOD FOR CLASSIFYING SUGAR BEET SEEDS, COMPRISING THE USAGE OF INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY[2013/34]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CLASSIFICATION DE GRAINES DE BETTERAVE À SUCRE, COMPRENANT L'UTILISATION D'UNE SPECTROSCOPIE INFRAROUGE[2013/34]
Entry into regional phase12.04.2013National basic fee paid 
12.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/34]
29.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/22]
25.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2004055211  (LESTANDER TORBJORN [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,13,14 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1, 4-5 * [Y] 5,6;
 [Y]WO2010000266  (AARHUS UNI DET JORDBRUGSVIDENS [DK], et al) [Y] 5,6 * figures 1-2,5 *;
 [A]US2003177525  (FENDER CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) [A] 1-9,13,14 * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] *;
 [A]WO2009118111  (COGNIS IP MAN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9,13,14 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH1151860  (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [A] 1-9,13,14 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH07260682  (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [A] 1-9,13,14 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US6080950  (JALINK HENDRIK [NL]) [X] 10,11 * figure 1; examples 5-6 *;
 [A]GB2195877  (NIPPON BEET SUGAR MFG) [A] 10-12 * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB776292  (AKADEMIE DER LANDWIRTSHAFTSWIS) [A] 10-12 * page 1, line 20 - line 60 *;
 [A]GB670461  (PHELPS VOGELSANG) [A] 10-12 * page 4, line 100 - page 5, line 60 *;
 [A]US3044619  (WILHELM KNOLLE) [A] 10-12 * column 1, line 55 - column 1, line 65 *
 [Y]  - TIGABU M ET AL, "Discrimination of viable and empty seeds of Pinus patula Schiede & Deppe with near-infrared spectroscopy", NEW FORESTS MAY 2003 KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS NL, (200305), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1023/A:1022916615477, pages 163 - 176, XP002613864 [Y] 5,6 * figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1022916615477
 [A]  - YUJI MUKASA ET AL, "Application of Near-Infrared Diffuse Reflectance Spectroscopic Analysis for Estimating the Ratio of True Seed Weight to Fruit Weight in Sugar Beet Seed", PLANT PRODUCTION SCIENCE, (20050101), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1626/pps.8.3, ISSN 1343-943X, pages 3 - 7, XP055012698 [A] 1-9,13,14 * figures 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1626/pps.8.3
 [X]  - MAISL M ET AL, "Process Monitoring using Three Dimensional Computed Tomography and Automatic Image Processing", INTERNET CITATION, (20060927), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.ndt.net/article/ecndt2006/doc/We.3.7.1.pdf, (20110506), XP002636101 [X] 10-12 * page 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *
by applicantEP1578544
 EP1401589
 US2004055211
 WO2010000266
    - MUKASA ET AL., PLANT PROD. SCI., (2005), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 3 - 7
    - MITTLER ET AL., "Hohe Saatgutqualität fur leistungsfähige Bestände", ZUCKERRUBE, (2004), vol. 53
    - DOWELL ET AL., CEREAL CHEM., vol. 83, no. 5, pages 537 - 543
    - DOWELL ET AL., CEREAL CHEM., vol. 86, no. 5, pages 527 - 533
    - TANNING ET AL., CEREAL CHEM., vol. 86, no. 6, pages 706 - 713
    - TIGABU, ODEN, NEW FORESTS, (2003), vol. 25, pages 163 - 176
    - PERRY, D.A., HARRISON, J.G., "Studies on the sensitivity of monogerm sugar beet germination to water", ANN. APPL. BIOL., (1974), vol. 77, pages 51 - 60
    - SAVITZKY, A., GOLAY, M.J.E., "Smoothing and Differentiation of Data by Simplified Least Squares Procedures", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1964), vol. 36, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1021/ac60214a047, pages 1627 - 1639, XP000560623

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac60214a047
    - STEINIER, TERMONIA, DELTOUR, ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 44, no. 11, pages 1906 - 1909
    - MAISL ET AL., "Process Monitoring using three dimensional Computed Tomography and Automatic Image Processing", DEUTSCHE GESELLSCHAFT FUR ZERSTORUNGSFREIE PRUFUNG E.V. -DGZFP
    - BERLIN: DGZFP, ISBN 3-931381-86-2, page WE.3.7.1, URL: http://publica.fraunhofer.de/documents/N-50556.html
    - HAENLEIN, M., KAPLAN, A.M., "A beginner's guide to partial least squares (PLS) analysis", UNDERSTANDING STATISTICS, (2004), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 283 - 297