Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2625266

EP2625266 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medizinische Hochschule Hannover
Carl-Neuberg-Strasse 1
30625 Hannover / DE
For all designated states
Biomimetics Technologies Inc.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, ON M6S 2X4 / CA
For all designated states
Stolz, Marvin
Leonhardtstrasse 19
14057 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Schmälzlin, Elmar
Bergholzer Str. 3
14473 Potsdam / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/39]For all designated states
Medizinische Hochschule Hannover
Carl-Neuberg-Strasse 1
30625 Hannover / DE
For all designated states
Biomimetics Technologies Inc.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, ON M6S 2X4 / CA
For all designated states
Stolz, Marvin
Niehbuhrstr. 71
10629 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Schmälzlin, Elmar
Bergholzer Str. 3
14473 Potsdam / DE
Former [2013/33]For all designated states
Medizinische Hochschule Hannover
Carl-Neuberg-Strasse 1
30625 Hannover / DE
For all designated states
Biomimetics Technologies Inc.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto ON M6S 2X4 / CA
For all designated states
Stolz, Marvin
Niehbuhrstr. 71
10629 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Schmälzlin, Elmar
Bergholzer Str. 3
14473 Potsdam / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMÄLZLIN, Elmar
Bergholzer Str. 3
14473 Potsdam / DE
02 / WEYAND, Birgit
Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1
30625 Hannover / DE
03 / ISRAELOWITZ, Meir
1010 Brodview Avenue Apt. 606
M4K 2R8 / CA
04 / VOGT, Peter
Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1
30625 Hannover / DE
05 / REIMERS, Kerstin
Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1
30625 Hannover / DE
06 / VON SCHROEDER, Herbert, P.
191 Ellis Avenue
M6S 2X4 Toronto, ON / CA
07 / GILLE, Christoph
Junostrasse 6d
13467 Berlin / DE
 [2013/52]
Former [2013/33]01 / SCHMÄLZLIN, Elmar
Bergholzer Str. 3
14473 Potsdam / DE
02 / WEYAND, Birgit
Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1
30625 Hannover / DE
03 / ISRAELOWITZ, Meir
Toronto
Ontario / CA
04 / VOGT, Peter
Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1
30625 Hannover / DE
05 / REIMERS, Kerstin
Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1
30625 Hannover / DE
06 / VON SCHROEDER, Herbert, P.
Toronto
Ontario / CA
07 / GILLE, Christoph
Toronto
Ontario / CA
Representative(s)Taruttis, Stefan Georg
TARUTTIS Patentanwaltskanzlei Aegidientorplatz 2b
30159 Hannover / DE
[2013/33]
Application number, filing date11771065.704.10.2011
[2016/39]
WO2011EP67344
Priority number, dateUS20100404320P04.10.2010         Original published format: US 404320 P
[2013/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012045756
Date:12.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2625266
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012
[2013/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2625266
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2625266
Date:21.12.2016
[2016/51]
Search report(s)International search reportEP12.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:C12Q3/00, G01N33/84, C12N5/0775, C12N5/00
[2016/20]
Former International [2013/33]C12N5/00, G01N21/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DREIDIMENSIONALEM GEWEBE[2013/33]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL TISSUE[2013/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN TISSU TRIDIMENSIONNEL[2013/33]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2013National basic fee paid 
02.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
08.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2016Fee for grant paid
15.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.03.2014
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
17.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
LU04.10.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
[2017/40]
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2004171094  (KLIMANT INGO [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * claims 5, 6 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * [Y] 1-17;
 [XY]US2005058842  (LIEBMANN-VINSON ANDREA [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0035] * * claims 1, 25, 30, 31 * [Y] 1-17
 [XY]  - ACOSTA M A ET AL, "Fluorescent microparticles for sensing cell microenvironment oxygen levels within 3D scaffolds", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 30, no. 17, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2009.02.021, ISSN 0142-9612, (20090601), pages 3068 - 3074, (20090314), XP026933211 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2009.02.021
 [XY]  - PETER C. THOMAS ET AL, "A Noninvasive Thin Film Sensor for Monitoring Oxygen Tension during in Vitro Cell Culture", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20091115), vol. 81, no. 22, doi:10.1021/ac9013379, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 9239 - 9246, XP055019142 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac9013379
Examination   - CHOU PI-TAI ET AL, "Phosphorescent dyes for organic light-emitting diodes.", CHEMISTRY (WEINHEIM AN DER BERGSTRASSE, GERMANY) 2007, (2007), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 380 - 395,
    - WANG XU-DONG ET AL, "Optical methods for sensing and imaging oxygen: materials, spectroscopies and applications.", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS 21 MAY 2014, (20140521), vol. 43, no. 10, ISSN 1460-4744, pages 3666 - 3761,
by applicantEP2031501
    - SCHMALZLIN ET AL., SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, (2006), pages 251 - 254,