blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2625266 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2625266



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 435
02.08.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Communication concerning a request to change bibliographic data after the decision to grant/decision to maintain the patent in a Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.09.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
05.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.09.2016 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 1
01.09.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
15.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.08.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.08.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
15.08.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.04.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.04.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.04.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
29.04.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
29.04.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
17.09.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
26.06.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
26.06.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
26.06.2015 Description Search / examination 1
26.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.06.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.06.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.06.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.02.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.02.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 133
22.01.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.12.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.12.2014 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.11.2014 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
06.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.07.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
14.07.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
11.07.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.03.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.01.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.01.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.01.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
16.01.2014 Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents Search / examination 2
10.01.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
10.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.01.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.01.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
08.01.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
08.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
08.01.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
08.01.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
26.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.11.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.10.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.10.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.09.2013 Deficiencies in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.07.2013 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.07.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.07.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.05.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.2013 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2013 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable PCT receiving Office 1
02.05.2013 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
02.05.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.04.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
15.02.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
10.05.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
12.04.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.04.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
22.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
05.12.2011 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable PCT receiving Office 2
14.11.2011 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
14.11.2011 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
14.11.2011 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
04.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
04.10.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
04.10.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
04.10.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 12
04.10.2011 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4