Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2625266


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017 [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017 [2017/40]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
04.08.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
28.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
15.06.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
05.05.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
21.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
18.11.2016 Correction of patent specification published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
26.08.2016 (Expected) grant published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
19.08.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.08.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.08.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.04.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.04.2016 Change - classification published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
15.04.2016 Change - classification published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
25.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.06.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.06.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.02.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.01.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.12.2014 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.07.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.07.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.03.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.03.2014 First examination report published on  16.04.2014  [2014/16]
10.01.2014 Amendment by applicant
06.12.2013 Change - extension states published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
22.11.2013 Change - inventor published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
19.10.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.07.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
12.07.2013 Request for examination filed published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
04.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
17.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
13.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
28.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication