blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2625266
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9222074Global Dossier 29.12.2015B2
US2013337433 19.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113877575 04.10.2011
WO2011EP67344 04.10.2011
US40432010 04.10.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2625266Global Dossier 21.12.2016B8
EP2625266 28.09.2016B1
EP2625266 14.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP67344 04.10.2011
US40432010 04.10.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012045756Global Dossier 16.05.2013A8
WO2012045756 12.04.2012A1
Priority number Date
US40432010 04.10.2010