Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2561664

EP2561664 - INTERFACE APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING MEDIA DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/09]INTERFACE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING MEDIA DATA
[2018/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.2020
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI, SI
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2019/10]
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / HWANG, Sung-Oh
c/o Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
02 / KEUM, Ji-Eun
c/o Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
03 / SONG, Jae-Yeon
c/o Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
04 / RHYU, Sung-Ryeul
c/o Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
05 / PARK, Kyung-Mo
c/o Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
 [2019/10]
Former [2013/09]01 / HWANG, Sung-Oh
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
02 / KEUM, Ji-Eun
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
03 / SONG, Jae-Yeon
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
04 / RHYU, Sung-Ryeul
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
05 / PARK, Kyung-Mo
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2013/09]Hutter, Jacobus Johannes
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date11772225.620.04.2011
[2019/10]
WO2011KR02836
Priority number, dateKR2010003618020.04.2010         Original published format: KR 20100036180
[2013/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011132937
Date:27.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2561664
Date:27.02.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011
[2013/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2561664
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2016/02]
Former International [2013/09]H04L29/06, H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN UND EMPFANGEN VON MEDIENDATEN[2018/40]
English:INTERFACE APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING MEDIA DATA[2018/40]
French:APPAREIL D'INTERFACE DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES MULTIMÉDIAS[2018/40]
Former [2013/09]SCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN UND EMPFANGEN VON MEDIENDATEN
Former [2013/09]INTERFACE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING MEDIA DATA
Former [2013/09]APPAREIL D'INTERFACE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES MULTIMÉDIAS
Entry into regional phase19.11.2012National basic fee paid 
19.11.2012Search fee paid 
19.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/09]
21.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2019Fee for grant paid
18.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19160863.7  / EP3518497
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2018
Opposition(s)09.12.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
DK06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
MC06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SI06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
LU20.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
[2020/11]
Former [2020/09]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
DK06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
MC06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
LU20.04.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2020/07]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
MC06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
LU20.04.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2020/04]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
LU20.04.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2020/03]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/52]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2667625  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-13 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0030]; figure 3 *
 [A]  - SUH, DOUG YOUNG ET AL, "Draft Call for Proposals on MMT", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2009-2012, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20091102), vol. Study Group 16, pages 1 - 11, XP017450181 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [XP]  - "MPEG Media Transport (MMT) Context and Objective;303 (GEN/16)", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2009-2012, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20100812), vol. Study Group 16, pages 1 - 5, XP017451958 [XP] 1-13 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2009003389  (JOUNG YE-SUN [KR], et al);
 [Y]US2009122714  (KATO YOSHIAKI [JP]);
 [A]US2004223547  (HUNG SZEPO ROBERT [US]);
 [A]US2006184790  (OLIVEIRA EDUARDO [US], et al)
 [X]  - S. BATTISTA ET AL., "A Multimedia Standard for the Third Millennium, Part 1", IEEE MULTIMEDIA, (1999), pages 74 - 83, XP002954696

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/93.809236
 [Y]  - M. RANSBURG ET AL., "Generic Streaming of Multimedia Content", PROCEEDINGS O F 9TH IASTED INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE INTERNET AND MULTIMEDIA AND APPLICATIO N, GRINDELWALD, SWITZERLAND, (20050221), pages 324 - 330, XP008162640
 [A]  - "RTP Payload Format for Transport of MPEG-4 Elementary Streams", IETF NETWOR K WORKING GROUP, RFC3640, (200311), XP015009422