Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2565951

EP2565951 - LIGHT EMITTING UNIT AND ILLUMINATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/10]LEAD FRAME, WIRING BOARD, LIGHT EMITTING UNIT, AND ILLUMINATING APPARATUS
[2018/43]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Change - classificationpublished on 27.03.2019 [2019/13]
22.02.2019Change - classificationpublished on 27.03.2019 [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2013/10]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / URANO, Yoji
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / YOKOTANI, Ryoji
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / KUZUHARA, Ikko
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / TANAKA, Kenichiro
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]01 / URANO, Yoji
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / YOKOTANI, Ryoji
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / KUZUHARA, Ikko
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / TANAKA, Kenichiro
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Representative(s)Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date11775017.426.04.2011
WO2011JP60193
Priority number, dateJP2011007277429.03.2011         Original published format: JP 2011072774
JP2011007277329.03.2011         Original published format: JP 2011072773
JP2011007277229.03.2011         Original published format: JP 2011072772
JP2010012509731.05.2010         Original published format: JP 2010125097
JP2010010118226.04.2010         Original published format: JP 2010101182
[2013/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011136236
Date:03.11.2011
Language:JA
[2011/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2565951
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.11.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/02, H05K1/18, H01L33/62, H01L33/64, H01L23/00, F21K9/90, F21V19/00, F21K9/20, F21K9/27, // H05K1/05, H05K3/20, H01L25/075, H01L33/48, F21Y105/10, F21Y103/10, F21Y115/10, F21Y107/90
[2017/18]
Former International [2013/10]H01L33/62, H01L33/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/10]
TitleGerman:LICHTEMITTIERENDE EINHEIT UND BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/43]
English:LIGHT EMITTING UNIT AND ILLUMINATING APPARATUS[2018/43]
French:UNITÉ ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE ET APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2018/43]
Former [2013/10]FÜHRUNGSRAHMEN, LEITERPLATTE, LICHTEMITTIERENDE EINHEIT UND BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2013/10]LEAD FRAME, WIRING BOARD, LIGHT EMITTING UNIT, AND ILLUMINATING APPARATUS
Former [2013/10]GRILLE DE CONNEXION, CARTE DE CÂBLAGE, UNITÉ ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE, ET APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE
Entry into regional phase19.10.2012Translation filed 
19.10.2012National basic fee paid 
19.10.2012Search fee paid 
19.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/10]
20.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009140285  (LIN SHUN-TIAN [TW], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,6,10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0037]; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US2008123334  (HOCHSTEIN PETER A [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,6,10 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] - [0 17] , [0019] , [0 20]; figure - *;
 [A]US2006169999  (PARK YOUNG S [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0065] , [0 66] , [0 69] - [0071] - [0 80]; figures 1-11, 16, 17 *;
 [A]JP2007258619  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 11-16 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH10502772  (QUANTUM DEVICES, INC.);
 [A]JP2006093470  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]JP2007035890  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD);
 [A]JP2001203395  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JP2001057446  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JP2000353826  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]WO2009119461  (SHIMANE PREFECTURAL GOVERNMENT [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2009054894  (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD);
 [A]JP2009105379  (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD);
 [A]JP2009130299  (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD);
 [A]JP2009130300  (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD);
 [A]JP2009076576  (SHARP KK);
 [A]JP2001044512  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]WO2008078791  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2006066631  (KYOCERA CORP);
 [A]JP2006147999  (KYOCERA CORP)
by applicantJP2006093470
 JP2007035890
 JPH11162233
 JP2009266432