Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2632562

EP2632562 - METHODS FOR CAPTURING VIRUS LIKE PARTICLES FROM PLANTS USING EXPANDED BED CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2018New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[2013/36]
Inventor(s)01 / LIHME, Allan
Lersø Parkallé 42
DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK
02 / OISHI, Karen
Rue des Battieux 15
CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH
03 / VAARST, Inga
Lersø Parkallé 42
DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK
04 / CABRERA, Rosa
Rue des Moulins 51
CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH
 [2013/36]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/36]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date11775978.727.10.2011
WO2011EP68919
Priority number, dateEP2010001401927.10.2010         Original published format: EP 10014019
[2013/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012055986
Date:03.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2632562
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012
[2013/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:B01D15/18, A61K39/00, C07K1/18, C07K14/42
[2013/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG VIRUSÄHNLICHER PARTIKEL AUS PFLANZEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON EXPANSIONSBETT- CHROMATOGRAFIE[2013/36]
English:METHODS FOR CAPTURING VIRUS LIKE PARTICLES FROM PLANTS USING EXPANDED BED CHROMATOGRAPHY[2013/36]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE CAPTURE DE PARTICULES DE TYPE VIRAL À PARTIR DE PLANTES À L'AIDE D'UNE CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN LIT EXPANSÉ[2013/36]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2013National basic fee paid 
27.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/36]
18.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
10.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1104479  (BIOSOURCE TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * examples 11,12; claim - *;
 [X]WO2004082397  (UPFRONT CHROMATOGRAPHY AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 5 * * page 10, line 19 - page 19, line 26 * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]  - T.J.MENKHAUS, C.E.GLATZ, "Compatibility of column inlet and adsorbent designs for processing of corn endosperm extract by expanded bed adsorption", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20040805), vol. 87, no. 3, pages 324 - 336, XP002630464 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * Paragraph "EBA Column Arrangements" Paragraph "EBA adsorbents";; table 1 * * Paragraph "Corn solids interactions with cation and anion exchange resins" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.20117
 [X]  - Y. BAI, C.E.GLATZ, "Capture of a recombinant protein from unclarified canola extract using streamline expanded bed anion exchange", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20030330), vol. 81, no. 7, pages 855 - 864, XP002630465 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * Paragraph "Materials and methods" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.10532
 [X]  - O.BERTRAND, S.COCHET, J.P.CARTRON, "Expanded bed chromatography for one-step purification of mannose binding lectin from tulip bulbs using mannose immobilized on DEAE Streamline", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (19980925), vol. 822, no. 1, pages 19 - 28, XP002630466 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * Paragraph "2. Experimental" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(98)00575-5
by applicantWO9113555
 WO9301791
 WO2004098533
    - MONAQUA TTM series, MONA INDUSTRIES, INC.
    - D'AOUST, M.-A., LAVOIE, P.-O., COUTURE, M.M.-J., TREPANIER, S., GUAY, J.-M., DARGIS, M., MONGRAND, S., LANDRY, N., WARD, B.J., VEZ, "Influenza virus-like particles produced by transient expression in Nicotiana benthamiana induce a protective immune response against a lethal viral challenge", PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (2008), vol. 6, pages 930 - 940, XP002598510