Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2640585

EP2640585 - VEHICLE HAVING AN AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.12.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
For all designated states
Hanon Systems
95, Sinilseo-ro
Daedeok-gu
306-230 Daejeon-si / KR
[2016/08]
Former [2016/04]For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
For all designated states
Halla Visteon Climate Control Corporation
95, Sinilseo-ro
Daedeok-gu
Daejeon-si / KR
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
For all designated states
Halla Visteon Climate Control Corporation
95, Sinilseo-ro
Daedeok-gu
Daejeon-si / KR
Former [2013/39]For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
For all designated states
Visteon Global Technologies, Inc.
One Village Center Drive
Van Buren Township, MI 48111 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHROEDER, Dirk
Römerstrasse 4
85107 Baar-Ebenhausen / DE
02 / HAMMER, Hans
Bischof-Meiser-Strasse 2a
85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE
03 / REBINGER, Christian
Sankt-Vitus-Strasse 7
86356 Neusäss / DE
04 / HEYL, Peter
Kornradenweg 90
50999 Köln / DE
 [2016/03]
Former [2013/40]01 / SCHROEDER, Dirk
Römerstrasse 4
85107 Baar-Ebenhausen / DE
02 / HAMMER, Hans
Bischof-Meiser-Strasse 2a
85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE
03 / REBINGER, Christian
sankt-vitus-Strasse 7
86356 Neusäss / DE
04 / HEYL, Peter
Kornradenweg 90
50999 Köln / DE
Former [2013/39]01 / SCHROEDER, Dirk
Römerstrasse 4
85107 Baar-Ebenhausen / DE
02 / HAMMER, Hans
Bischof-Meiser-Strasse 2a
85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE
03 / REBINGER, Christian
Cusanusstr. 31
85049 Ingolstadt / DE
04 / HEYL, Peter
Kornradenweg 90
50999 Köln / DE
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]Sperling, Thomas
Sperling, Fischer & Heyner
Patentanwälte
Tolkewitzer Straße 22
01277 Dresden / DE
Former [2013/39]Sperling, Thomas
Sperling, Fischer & Heyner Patentanwälte Niederwaldstraße 27
01277 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date11776719.429.10.2011
[2016/04]
WO2011EP05484
Priority number, dateDE2010105147115.11.2010         Original published format: DE102010051471
[2013/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012065687
Date:24.05.2012
Language:DE
[2012/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2640585
Date:25.09.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012
[2013/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2640585
Date:27.01.2016
Language:DE
[2016/04]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2640585
Date:23.03.2016
[2016/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/00
[2013/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUG MIT EINER KLIMAANLAGE[2013/39]
English:VEHICLE HAVING AN AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM[2013/39]
French:VÉHICULE DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION[2013/39]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2013National basic fee paid 
11.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/39]
20.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2015Fee for grant paid
26.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.02.2016Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.08.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.10.2016   
MAHLE International GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Wartbergstrasse 14
70191 Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/48]
06.12.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.03.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.02.2018Date of oral proceedings
26.02.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.02.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.04.2018Appeal received No.  T0995/18
05.07.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.10.2011
AL27.01.2016
CY27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
MK27.01.2016
MT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
SM27.01.2016
TR27.01.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
AT29.10.2016
IE29.10.2016
LU29.10.2016
BE31.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU29.10.2011
CY27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
MK27.01.2016
MT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
SM27.01.2016
TR27.01.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
AT29.10.2016
IE29.10.2016
LU29.10.2016
BE31.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU29.10.2011
CY27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
MK27.01.2016
MT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
SM27.01.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
AT29.10.2016
IE29.10.2016
LU29.10.2016
BE31.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2018/28]HU29.10.2011
CY27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
MK27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
SM27.01.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
AT29.10.2016
IE29.10.2016
LU29.10.2016
BE31.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2018/10]CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
SM27.01.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
AT29.10.2016
IE29.10.2016
LU29.10.2016
BE31.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/51]CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
SM27.01.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
IE29.10.2016
LU29.10.2016
BE31.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/43]CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
SM27.01.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
LU29.10.2016
BE31.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/12]CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
SM27.01.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
BE31.10.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
SM27.01.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/49]DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/46]DK27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/39]ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RS27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/38]ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/36]ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL27.01.2016
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE102005005430  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10 * paragraph [0034]; figure 5 * [Y] 3,5,6,8,9;
 [Y]US6430951  (IRITANI KUNIO [JP], et al) [Y] 3,5,6,8,9 * column 69, line 57 - column 71, line 7; figure 86 * * column 74, line 60 - column 75, line 24; figure 92 *;
 [X]US2003182961  (NISHIDA SHIN [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraph [0078]; figure 6 *;
 [AD]DE10253357  (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE10253357
OppositionDE102005005430
 US6430951
 US2003182961
 DE10253357
 DE102008043823
 DE4238853
 EP0480330
 WO9606748
 JP2000071756
 EP0643278
 EP0401752
 US5355689
 US6422308
 JPH11105541