Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2567353

EP2567353 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING AUTOMATICALLY UPDATED PRODUCT INSERTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
1000 Alfred Nobel Drive
Hercules, CA 94547 / US
[2013/11]
Inventor(s)01 / BURDETTE, Daniel
2107 Drake Drive
Richardson Texas 75081 / US
02 / LE-THI, Phuong
22965 Oakstone
Mission Viejo California 92692 / US
 [2013/11]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/11]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Patentanwälte
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date11778166.603.05.2011
WO2011US34991
Priority number, dateUS20100330833P03.05.2010         Original published format: US 330833 P
[2013/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011140084
Date:10.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2567353
Date:13.03.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011
[2013/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.11.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, G06Q10/00
[2014/12]
Former International [2013/11]G06Q10/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/11]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG AUTOMATISCH AKTUALISIERTER PRODUKTEINSÄTZE[2013/11]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING AUTOMATICALLY UPDATED PRODUCT INSERTS[2013/11]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN PLACE D'INSERTS À MISE À JOUR AUTOMATIQUE POUR PRODUITS[2013/11]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2012National basic fee paid 
25.10.2012Search fee paid 
25.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/11]
09.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination12.10.2017Appeal received No.  T0223/18
14.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[L]  - "STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP", 20071101, (20071101), XP002456252 [L] 1-15 * The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 92 EPC) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due to their notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the accompanying Opinion. *
 [L]  - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * Basis for the declaration that documentary evidence is not required due to the notoriety of the claimed and disclosed technological subject-matter.; page 593, paragraph 4 *
International search[Y]US2009222400  (KUPERSHMIDT ILYA [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007135997  (HYTOPOULOS EVANGELOS [US]);
 [Y]US2008046510  (BEAUCHAMP TIM J [US], et al);
 [A]US2009063259  (CYRUS RAMIN [US], et al)