Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2569752

EP2569752 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND MACHINE-READABLE STORAGE MEDIA FOR INTERFACING WITH A COMPUTER FLIGHT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.01.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Interruptionpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
One Jet, Inc.
1100 Larkspur Landing Circle, Suite 340
Larkspur, CA 94939 / US
[2015/16]
Former [2013/12]For all designated states
Primair, Inc.
1100 Larkspur Landing Circle, Suite 340
Larkspur, CA 94939 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MAGUIRE, Matthew R.
1 Leighton Street
Unit 510
Cambridge Massassachusetts 02141 / US
02 / SMITH, Barry C.
6286 Willow Gate
Dallas Texas 75233 / US
03 / DWYER, Ronald J.
8251 Buena Vista Drive
Denver North Carolina 28037 / US
 [2013/12]
Representative(s)Derry, Paul Stefan , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2013/12]
Application number, filing date11781139.810.05.2011
WO2011US35916
Priority number, dateUS20100333452P11.05.2010         Original published format: US 333452 P
[2013/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011143212
Date:17.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2569752
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011
[2013/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/00
[2013/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/12]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND MASCHINENLESBARE SPEICHERMEDIEN ZUR INTERAKTION MIT EINEM FLUGCOMPUTERSYSTEM[2013/12]
English:SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND MACHINE-READABLE STORAGE MEDIA FOR INTERFACING WITH A COMPUTER FLIGHT SYSTEM[2013/12]
French:SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET SUPPORTS DE STOCKAGE LISIBLES PAR MACHINE POUR FORMER L'INTERFAÇAGE AVEC UN SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE DE GESTION DES VOLS[2013/12]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2012National basic fee paid 
11.12.2012Search fee paid 
11.12.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/12]
24.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
14.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.04.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Appeal following examination25.03.2014Appeal received No.  T1963/14
22.08.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Stay/Interruption17.10.2018Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2019/28]
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US7562027  (BAGGETT, DAVID ET AL.);
 [Y]US2004249685  (DOUGLAS, CRAIG RAYMOND);
 [A]US2006022037  (STROTHMANN, RUSSELL I. ET AL.);
 [A]US2005228702  (CHRISTOPHER, FAIRBANKS ET AL.)