Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2569046 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2569046



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 495
09.10.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.12.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
23.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.10.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
23.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
23.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.07.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 73
04.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 73
14.06.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.06.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
04.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
04.06.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
04.06.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
04.06.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
04.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.11.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 3
08.11.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
06.03.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
20.02.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.01.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
21.12.2012 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
19.12.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.12.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
30.11.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.11.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.11.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
29.11.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
29.11.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
21.09.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.12.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
06.12.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
06.12.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 61
06.12.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
06.12.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
17.11.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
17.11.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 75