Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2613631

EP2613631 - USE OF 6-SUBSTITUTED 9-HALOGENALKYL PURINES FOR REGULATION OF GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT OF WHOLE PLANTS, PLANT CELLS AND PLANT ORGANS; NOVEL 6-SUBSTITUTED 9-HALOGENALKYL PURINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/29]USE OF 6 - SUBSTITUTED 9 - HALOGENALKYL PURINES FOR REGULATION OF GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT OF WHOLE PLANTS, PLANT CELLS AND PLANT ORGANS; NOVEL 6 - SUBSTITUTED 9 -HALOGENALKYL PURINES
[2016/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
[2013/29]
Inventor(s)01 / MIK, Vaclav
Sidliste Miru 984/4
742 35 Odry / CZ
02 / SZUCOVA, Lucie
Handkeho 1A/757
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
03 / DOLEZAL, Karel
Posluchov 31
783 65 Hlubocky / CZ
04 / SPICHAL, Lukas
Tr. Svornosti 14
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
05 / GALUSZKA, Petr
Kosinova 7
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
06 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
07 / GRUZ, Jiri
U stavu 138
783 14 Bohunovice / CZ
 [2013/29]
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina
Inventia s.r.o.
Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2013/29]
Application number, filing date11781999.502.09.2011
[2016/15]
WO2011CZ00086
Priority number, dateCZ2010000067007.09.2010         Original published format: CZ 20100670
[2013/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012031574
Date:15.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2613631
Date:17.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2012
[2013/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2613631
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
Search report(s)International search reportEP15.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/90, C07D473/34, A01P21/00
[2013/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON 6-SUBSTITUIERTEN 9-HALOGENALKYL PURINEN ZUR REGULIERUNG DES WACHSTUMS UND DER ENTWICKLUNG VON PFLANZEN, PLFANZENZELLEN UND PLFANZENORGANEN; NEUE 6-SUBSTITUIERTE 9-HALOGENALKYL PURINE[2016/07]
English:USE OF 6-SUBSTITUTED 9-HALOGENALKYL PURINES FOR REGULATION OF GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT OF WHOLE PLANTS, PLANT CELLS AND PLANT ORGANS; NOVEL 6-SUBSTITUTED 9-HALOGENALKYL PURINES[2016/07]
French:UTILISATION DES 9-HALOGÈNOALKYLE-PURINES 6-SUBSTITUÉS POUR LA REGULATION DE LA CROISSANCE ET DU DÉVELOPPEMENT DES PLANTES, DES CELLULES VÉGÉTALES ET DES ORGANES DE PLANTES; DES 9-HALOGÈNOALKYLE-PURINES 6-SUBSTITUÉS NOUVEAUX[2016/07]
Former [2013/29]"VERWENDUNG VON 6 - SUBSTITUIERTEN 9 - HALOGENALKYLPURINEN ZUR REGULIERUNG DES WACHSTUMS UND DER ENTWICKLUNG VON GANZEN PFLANZEN, PFLANZENZELLEN UND PFLANZENORGANEN; NEUARTIGE 6 - SUBSTITUIERTE 9 -HALOGENALKYLPURINE "
Former [2013/29]USE OF 6 - SUBSTITUTED 9 - HALOGENALKYL PURINES FOR REGULATION OF GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT OF WHOLE PLANTS, PLANT CELLS AND PLANT ORGANS; NOVEL 6 - SUBSTITUTED 9 -HALOGENALKYL PURINES
Former [2013/29]UTILISATION DE PURINES 9-HALOGÉNOALKYLE SUBSTITUÉES EN POSITION 6 DESTINÉES POUR RÉGULER LA CROISSANCE ET LE DÉVELOPPEMENT DE PLANTES ENTIÈRES, DE CELLULES VÉGÉTALES ET D'ORGANES VÉGÉTAUX, NOUVELLES PURINES 9-HALOGÉNOALKYLE SUBSTITUÉES EN POSITION 6
Entry into regional phase02.04.2013National basic fee paid 
02.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/29]
28.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2016Fee for grant paid
10.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2014
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
GB02.09.2016
IE02.09.2016
LU02.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
[2017/41]
Former [2017/37]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
GB02.09.2016
IE02.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/31]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US3213095  (EDWARD BAMBURY RONALD, et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO03040144  (USTAV EX BOTAN AKADEMIE VED CE [CZ], et al) [A] 1-12 * examples 7-11 *
 [Y]  - ZHANG R ET AL, "CYTOKININ BIOCHEMISTRY IN RELATION TO LEAF SENESCENCE III. THE SENESCENCE-RETARDING ACTIVITY AND METABOLISM OF 9-SUBSTITUTED 6 BENZYLAMINOPURINES IN SOYBEAN LEAVES", JOURNAL OF PLANT GROWTH REGULATION, SPRINGER VERLAG, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19890101), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 0721-7595, pages 181 - 198, XP008128462 [Y] 1-12 * table 1 * * compound 5 * * figure 3 * * page 194, line 37 - line 41 * * page 181, line 1 - page 182, line 8 *
 [Y]  - HASHIZUME ET AL, "Synthesis and biological activity of some new 6 benzylamino 9 alkylpurines", PLANT GROWTH SUBSTANCES 1973 : PROCEEDINGS OF THE 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PLANT GROWTH SUBSTANCES HELD IN TOKYO, JAPAN, AUG. 26 - SEPT. 1, 1973, TOKYO : HIROKAWA PUBL, JP, (19740101), pages 462 - 467, XP009155372 [Y] 1-12 * sentence 14 - sentence 18 * * figure 3 *
 [Y]  - BRATHE A ET AL, "Synthesis of 6-Alkenyl- and 6-Alkynylpurines with Cytokinin Activity", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990101), vol. 55, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(98)01027-8, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 211 - 228, XP004150864 [Y] 1-12 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(98)01027-8
 [XDY]  - N P RAMZAEVA, M Y LIDAK, Y S GOL'DBERG, M V SHIMANSKAYA, "Alkylation of 6-substituted purines by .alpha.-bromo-.omega.-halogenoalkanes under conditions of phase-transfer catalysis", J. ORG. CHEM. USSR (ENGL. TRANSL.), (1988), vol. 24, pages 984 - 987, XP009155423 [XD] 11 * compounds IV, VI, VII, XI * [Y] 1-12
 [Y]  - N P Ramzaeva ET AL, "ALKYLATION OF SOME 6-SUBSTITUTED PURINES UNDER INTERPHASE CATALYSIS CONDITIONS", Chemistry of Heterocyclic Compounds, doi:10.1007/BF00475484, (19870101), pages 93 - 98, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/ug23982050w22221/fulltext.pdf, (20120112), XP055016374 [Y] 1-12 * compounds Ia, Ib *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00475484
 [Y]  - "79 6-benzylaminopurine Plant growth regulator", The Pesticide Manual - A World Compendium - 15th Edition, Alton, Hampshire, GU34 2QD, United Kingdom, British Crop Protection Council, pages 99 - 100, ISBN 978-1-90-139618-8, XP055016475 [Y] 4-7 * Applications *
 [Y]  - Tony Storr, "Practical Biotechnology: Cloned cauliflower", Plant tissue culture: Experimenting with Industry No.13., (19950101), URL: http://www.ncbe.reading.ac.uk/ncbe/protocols/PRACBIOTECH/PDF/cauli.pdf, (20120113), XP055016478 [Y] 8 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - WERNER T ET AL, "Cytokinin-deficient transgenic Arabidopsis plants show multiple developmental alterations indicating opposite functions of cytokinins in the regulation of shoot and root meristem activity", THE PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT BIOLOGISTS, US, (20031101), vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1105/TPC.014928, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 2532 - 2550, XP002288482 [Y] 4-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.014928
 [A]  - ELLIOTT D C ET AL, "Structural analogs in the study of cytokinin action", PLANT GROWTH SUBSTANCES 1970 : PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PLANT GROWTH SUBSTANCES HELD IN CANBERRA, AUSTRALIA DEC. 7-11., 1970,, (19720101), ISBN 3-540-05850-8, pages 459 - 466, XP009155371 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GAN ET AL, "Inhibition of leaf senescence by autoregulated production of cytokinin", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19951222), vol. 270, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.270.5244.1986, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1986 - 1988, XP002085505 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.270.5244.1986
Examination GB2041359
  WO9009178
  CA657337
by applicantGB1027756
 EP0155911
 WO9734485
    - BILYEU ET AL., PLANT PHYS., (2001), vol. 125, page 378,
    - SMEHILOVA ET AL., J.EXPER.BOT., (2009), vol. 60, page 2701,
    - VYROUBALOVA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2009), vol. 151, page 433,
    - KUIPER ET AL., PLANT AND SOIL, (1990), vol. 123, page 243,
    - DAVIES, ZHANG, ANN. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL. PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 42, page 55,
    - HAVLOVA, PLANT CELL ENV., (2008), vol. 31, page 341,
    - EISINGER, PLANT PHYS., (1977), vol. 90, page 1316,
    - LARA ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2004), vol. 16, page 1276,
    - WINKLER ET AL., J. EXPER. BOT., (2006), vol. 57, page 391,
    - HE ET AL., J. EXPER. BOT., (2005), vol. 56, pages 1117 - 1128,
    - GAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, page 1986,
    - WERNER ET AL., PLANT BIOL., (2003), vol. 8, page 371,
    - LARA, PLANT CELL, (2004), vol. 16, page 1276,
    - MILLER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1956), vol. 78, page 1375,
    - RICHMOND, LANG, SCIENCE, (1957), vol. 125, page 650,
    - ZHANG, LETHAM, J.PLANT GROWTH REGUL., (1989), vol. 8, page 181,
    - KUHNLE ET AL., PHYSIOL. PLANT., (1977), vol. 41, page 14,
    - EISINGER, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1977), vol. 59, page 707,
    - KUDRYAKOVA ET AL., PLANT GROWTH REGUL., (2001), vol. 56, page 21,
    - ZHANG, LETHMM, J.PLANT GROWTH REGUL., (1989), vol. 8, page 181,
    - FOX ET AL., PLANT PHYS., (1971), vol. 47, page 275,
    - HOLUB ET AL., PLANT GROWTH REGUL, (1998), vol. 26, pages 109 - 115,
    - WERNER ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (2001), vol. 98, pages 10487 - 92,
    - WERNER ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2003), vol. 15, pages 2532 - 50,
    - RAMZAYEVA ET AL., ZURNAL ORGANICESKOJ CHIMII, (1988), pages 1090 - 1094,
    - McCutcheon's Detergents and Emulsifiers Annual, MC PUBLISHING CORP.,
    - STACHE, H., Tensid-Taschenbuch, CARL HANSER VERLAG,
    - M., J.ASH, Encyclopedia of Surfactants, CHEMICAL PUBLISHING CO., vol. 1-3,
    - HOLUB ET AL., PLANT GROWTH REGUL., (1998), vol. 26, pages 109 - 115,
    - WERNER, T. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 10487 - 92,
    - SCHWARZ ET AL., PLANT PHYS., (2003), vol. 131, pages 1591 - 1601,
    - TAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 12235 - 40,