Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2572153 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2572153



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1047
16.06.2021 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
02.06.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.05.2021 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
21.05.2021 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 28
21.05.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
21.05.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
07.04.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.04.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.04.2021 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 5
23.03.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
23.03.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
23.03.2021 Claims Appeal 2
23.03.2021 Claims Appeal 2
23.03.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.03.2021 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 3
22.03.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.03.2021 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
18.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.03.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
15.03.2021 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
15.03.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 6
15.03.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 6
11.03.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 1
08.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.03.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.03.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2021 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
04.03.2021 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
02.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.03.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.03.2021 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
25.02.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.02.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
22.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.01.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
19.01.2021 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 78
06.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.01.2021 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
22.12.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.12.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.12.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.12.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.12.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.12.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 2
16.12.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 3
16.12.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 1
16.12.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 1
16.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.12.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
10.11.2020 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
10.11.2020 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
03.11.2020 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
02.07.2020 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.07.2020 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.06.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
29.06.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
29.06.2020 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
25.06.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2020 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.06.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.06.2020 General enquiry Appeal 1
17.06.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.03.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.09.2019 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
02.10.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.06.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
15.02.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
09.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
09.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
09.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
09.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.02.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
15.01.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
15.01.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.12.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
15.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.12.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
17.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
10.10.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
10.10.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
10.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
10.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.09.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
20.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.06.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
06.02.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.02.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.12.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
22.08.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
13.07.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
13.07.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 79
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.07.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.10.2015 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.08.2015 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
14.08.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
28.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.07.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.07.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
28.07.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
28.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.06.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 26
18.06.2015 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 26
30.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.01.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 26
08.01.2015 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 26
22.05.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.05.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.03.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.03.2014 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.11.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
27.02.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
22.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.11.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.11.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
22.11.2012 Priority search results Search / examination 2
22.11.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.09.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.04.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
12.04.2012 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
23.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
23.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2
28.12.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
24.11.2011 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 28
11.11.2011 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
11.11.2011 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
11.11.2011 Claims International Searching Authority 3
11.11.2011 Claims International Searching Authority 3
11.11.2011 Description International Searching Authority 18
11.11.2011 Drawings International Searching Authority 5
09.09.2011 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1