Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2640590

EP2640590 - ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR AIR INLET, METHOD FOR ADJUSTING AN AIR INLET WITH AN ADJUSTMENT DEVICE, MOTOR VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH AN AIR INLET HAVING AN ADJUSTMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.05.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MCi (Mirror Controls International) Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
3447 GK Woerden / NL
[2013/39]
Inventor(s)01 / BOOM, Stephen Alexander George Gustavo
Suezkade 95
NL-2517 BZ Den Haag / NL
02 / DE VRIES, Erik Alfred Simeon
Lekdijk west 63
NL-2871 MN Schoonhoven / NL
 [2013/39]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/39]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date11782253.609.11.2011
WO2011NL50766
Priority number, dateNL2010200569715.11.2010         Original published format: NL 2005697
[2013/39]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012067502
Date:24.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2640590
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012
[2013/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2640590
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60K11/04, B60K11/08
[2013/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR LUFTEINLASS, VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINES LUFTEINLASSES MIT EINER EINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM LUFTEINLASS MIT EINER EINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2013/39]
English:ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR AIR INLET, METHOD FOR ADJUSTING AN AIR INLET WITH AN ADJUSTMENT DEVICE, MOTOR VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH AN AIR INLET HAVING AN ADJUSTMENT DEVICE[2013/39]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE POUR ENTRÉE D'AIR, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE POUR UNE ENTRÉE D'AIR COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE, VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE ENTRÉE D'AIR AYANT UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE[2013/39]
Entry into regional phase14.06.2013National basic fee paid 
14.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/39]
24.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2014Fee for grant paid
30.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.04.2015  07.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Magna Auteca AG
Elin-Süd-Straße 14
8160 Krottendorf/Weiz / AT
Opponent's representative
Zangger, Bernd
Magna International Europe GmbH
Patentabteilung
Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317
8041 Graz / AT
 02  21.07.2015  19.04.2018  WITHDRAWN
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft Coburg
Max-Brose-Strasse 1
96450 Coburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
 [2018/22]
Former [2016/09]
Opponent(s)01  30.04.2015  07.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Magna Auteca AG
Elin-Süd-Straße 14
8160 Krottendorf/Weiz / AT
Opponent's representative
Zangger, Bernd
Magna International Europe GmbH
Patentabteilung
Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317
8041 Graz / AT
 02  21.07.2015  16.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft Coburg
Max-Brose-Strasse 1
96450 Coburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Former [2015/38]
Opponent(s)01  30.04.2015  07.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Magna Auteca AG
Elin-Süd-Straße 14
8160 Krottendorf/Weiz / AT
Opponent's representative
Zangger, Bernd
MAGNA International Europe AG
Patentabteilung
Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317 / VG Nord
8041 Graz / AT
 02  21.07.2015  16.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft Coburg
Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50
96450 Coburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Former [2015/29]
Opponent(s)01  30.04.2015  07.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Magna Auteca AG
Elin-Süd-Straße 14
8160 Krottendorf/Weiz / AT
Opponent's representative
Zangger, Bernd
MAGNA International Europe AG
Patentabteilung
Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317 / VG Nord
8041 Graz / AT
 02  09.06.2015   
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft Coburg
Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50
96450 Coburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schröder, Christoph
Patentanwälte
Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Former [2015/24]
Opponent(s)01  30.04.2015  07.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Magna Auteca AG
Elin-Süd-Straße 14
8160 Krottendorf/Weiz / AT
Opponent's representative
Zangger, Bernd
MAGNA International Europe AG
Patentabteilung
Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317 / VG Nord
8041 Graz / AT
17.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.04.2018Date of oral proceedings
14.05.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.05.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition06.07.2018Appeal received No.  T1766/18
24.09.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Date:27.02.2014
[2014/16]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.11.2011
AL10.09.2014
AT10.09.2014
BE10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
MK10.09.2014
MT10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
TR10.09.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU09.11.2011
AT10.09.2014
BE10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
MK10.09.2014
MT10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
TR10.09.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2016/33]HU09.11.2011
AT10.09.2014
BE10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
MT10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
TR10.09.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2016/32]HU09.11.2011
AT10.09.2014
BE10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2016/31]AT10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2016/22]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/51]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/46]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
IE09.11.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/33]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/32]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/30]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
LU09.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
RS10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT10.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3701584  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,9,10,12,14-16 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 33; figure - *;
 [A]WO2007130847  (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1,8,14-16 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 12; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE10307632  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,14-16 * paragraphs [0011] , [0019] - [0023]; figures 3,4 *
by applicantDE3701584