Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2640281

EP2640281 - SURGICAL CUTTING GUIDE, SURGICAL ALIGNMENT GUIDE AND SURGICAL INSTRUMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2015
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT, TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy (Ireland)
Loughbeg County Cork
Ringaskiddy / IE
[2013/39]
Inventor(s)01 / BOOTH, Kevin
c/o DePuy International Limited
St Anthony's Road
Beeston
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 8DT / GB
02 / FENTON, Gary
c/o DePuy International Limited
St Anthony's Road
Beeston
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 8DT / GB
03 / VERTERAMO, Alberto
c/o DePuy International Limited
St Anthony's Road
Beeston
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 8DT / GB
 [2013/39]
Representative(s)Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/39]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Tower North Central
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date11782665.108.11.2011
WO2011GB52171
Priority number, dateGB2010001949118.11.2010         Original published format: GB 201019491
[2013/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012066304
Date:24.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2640281
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012
[2013/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2640281
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/22]
Search report(s)International search reportEP24.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/15
[2013/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHE SCHNEIDEFÜHRUNG, CHIRURGISCHE AUSRICHTUNGSFÜHRUNG UND CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENTENSYSTEM[2014/13]
English:SURGICAL CUTTING GUIDE, SURGICAL ALIGNMENT GUIDE AND SURGICAL INSTRUMENT SYSTEM[2013/39]
French:GUIDE DE COUPE CHIRURGICAL, GUIDE D'ALIGNEMENT CHIRURGICAL ET SYSTÈME D'INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICALS[2014/13]
Former [2013/39]CHIRURGISCHE SCHNEIDFÜHRUNG, CHIRURGISCHE AUSRICHTUNGSFÜHRUNG UND CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENTENSYSTEM
Former [2013/39]GUIDE DE COUPE CHIRURGICAL, GUIDE D'ALIGNEMENT CHIRURGICAL ET SYSTÈME D'INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL
Entry into regional phase26.04.2013National basic fee paid 
26.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
26.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/39]
18.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2014Fee for grant paid
15.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.03.2014
Opposition(s)03.03.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.11.2011
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
TR28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU08.11.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU08.11.2011
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2016/31]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2016/22]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2015/36]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2014/52]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY28.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US6013081  (BURKINSHAW BRIAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-10 * column 4, lines 33-64; figure - *;
 [X]EP1574177  (ZIMMER TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052]; figure 8 *;
 [X]FR2943528  (TORNIER SA [FR]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 6, lines 3-28; figure - *;
 [X]US5628749  (VENDRELY TIM [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 6, lines 8-42; figures 6,7 *;
 [X]US2009043310  (RASMUSSEN G LYNN [US]) [X] 6,8,9 * paragraphs [0090] - [0093]; figures 23,24 *;
 [A]EP1444957  (HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] - [0031]; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2002198531  (MILLARD THIERRY [FR], et al) [A] 6 * paragraph [0032]; figure - *;
 [A]US7794467  (MCGINLEY BRIAN J [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 12, lines 3-14; figure - *
by applicantWO2009037471