EP2593497 - SILICONE RESINS AND THEIR USE IN POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Silicones Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 1-5-1, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0004 / JP | For all designated states Dow (Shanghai) Management Co., Ltd. First Floor 110-1, No. 268 Delin Road China (Shanghai) Pilot Free-Trade Zone / CN | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states Dow Silicones Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US | ||
For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 1-5-1, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0004 / JP | |||
For all designated states Dow Corning (Shanghai) Management Co., Ltd. 1077, Zhangheng Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 1-5-1, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0004 / JP | |||
For all designated states Dow Corning (Shanghai) Management Co., Ltd. 1077, Zhangheng Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 1-5-1, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0004 / JP | |||
For all designated states Dow Corning (Shanghai) Co. Ltd. 1077 Zhangheng Road Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACKER, Michael Borngasse 20 55126 Mainz / DE | 02 /
CHEVALIER, Pierre 97 R.B. Delespaul 59000 Lille / FR | 03 /
LIU, Zhihua Room 101 Building 17 1333 Nong Meichuan Road Putuo District Shanghai 200333 / CN | 04 /
MARQUES, Ana Rua dos Escritores 7 1C Portela LRS P-2685-207 / PT | 05 /
ONODERA, Satoshi 2-2, Chigusa-Kaigan Ichihara City Chiba / JP | 06 /
RERAT, Vincent Rue de la Briqueterie 22 B-1480 Tubize / BE | 07 /
SASAKI, Motoshi 2-2 Chigusa Kaigan Ichihara City Chiba Prefecture 299-0108 / JP | [2013/28] |
Former [2013/21] | 01 /
BACKER, Michael Borngasse 20 55126 Mainz / DE | ||
02 /
CHEVALIER, Pierre 97 R.B. Delespaul 59000 Lille / FR | |||
03 /
LIU, Zhihua Room 101 Building 17 1333 Nong Meichuan Road Putuo District Shanghai 200333 / CN | |||
04 /
MARQUES, Ana Rua dos Escritores 7 1C Portela LRS P-2685-207 / PT | |||
05 /
ONODERA, Satoshi 5-1-1 (2-1005) Chiharadaiminami Ichihara City Chiba 290-0142 / JP | |||
06 /
RERAT, Vincent Rue de la Briqueterie 22 B-1480 Tubize / BE | |||
07 /
SASAKI, Motoshi 2-2 Chigusa Kaigan Ichihara City Chiba Prefecture 299-0108 / JP | Representative(s) | Donlan, Andrew Michael Dow Silicones UK Limited Intellectual Property Departement Cardiff Road Barry, South Glamorgan CF63 2YL / GB | [2018/25] |
Former [2013/21] | Donlan, Andrew Michael Dow corning limited Intellectual Property Departement Cardiff road Barry South Glamorgan CF63 2YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11782848.3 | 16.05.2011 | [2018/25] | WO2011CN00845 | Priority number, date | WO2010CN00778 | 01.06.2010 Original published format: PCT/CN2010/000778 | WO2010CN00717 | 20.05.2010 Original published format: PCT/CN2010/000717 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011143931 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593497 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2593497 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/30, C08G77/26, C08G77/388, C08G77/395, C08L83/04 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
C08G77/395 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/30 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/388 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/00 (KR);
C08L83/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILIKONHARZE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2013/21] | English: | SILICONE RESINS AND THEIR USE IN POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | [2013/21] | French: | RÉSINES SILICONE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES COMPOSITIONS DE POLYMÈRE | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 31.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 19.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2011 | AL | 20.06.2018 | AT | 20.06.2018 | CY | 20.06.2018 | CZ | 20.06.2018 | DK | 20.06.2018 | EE | 20.06.2018 | ES | 20.06.2018 | FI | 20.06.2018 | HR | 20.06.2018 | IT | 20.06.2018 | LT | 20.06.2018 | LV | 20.06.2018 | MC | 20.06.2018 | MK | 20.06.2018 | MT | 20.06.2018 | NL | 20.06.2018 | PL | 20.06.2018 | RO | 20.06.2018 | RS | 20.06.2018 | SE | 20.06.2018 | SI | 20.06.2018 | SK | 20.06.2018 | SM | 20.06.2018 | TR | 20.06.2018 | BG | 20.09.2018 | NO | 20.09.2018 | GR | 21.09.2018 | IS | 20.10.2018 | PT | 22.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.05.2011 | |
AL | 20.06.2018 | ||
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.05.2011 | |
AL | 20.06.2018 | ||
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 20.06.2018 | |
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU757537 (BUGERENKO EVGENIJ F [SU], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN1974721 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG [CN]) [A] 1-15* example -; claim - *; | [XA]CN101665573 (UNIV SICHUAN) [X] 1,2,12,13 * embodiments 1-16,application examples 1-3;; example -; claim - * [A] 3-11,14,15 | International search | [X]CN1509159 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]); | [X]CN1974721 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG [CN]); | [X]CN101274998 (GUANGZHOU INST OF CHEMISTRY [CN]); | [X]CN101665573 (UNIV SICHUAN); | [X] - SHU YIN, "Synthesis of a Novel Phosphorus-Containing Flame Retardant and the Thermal Stability of Flame Retarded PC/ABS", JOURNAL OF FUNCTIONAL POLYMER, (2008), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 159 - 163, XP008167167 | [X] - WU, DAN ET AL., "Synthesis Characterization of a Novel Flame Retardant Containing Silicon and Its Application in PC/ABS Alloy", POLYMER MATERIALS SCIENCE & ENGINEERING, (2008), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 125 - 128, XP008167166 | [X] - XILEI CHEN, "Preparation and Thermal Properties of a Novel flame-retardant Coating", POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, (2007), vol. 92, pages 1141 - 1150, XP022080704 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymdegradstab.2007.01.031 | [A] - YONGHONG LIU, "Polybenzoxazine Containing Polysilsesquioxane: Preparation and Thermal Properties", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 99, pages 927 - 936, XP055099900 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.22270 |