Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2599326

EP2599326 - PREDICTIVE WAKEUP FOR PUSH-TO-TALK-OVER-CELLULAR (POC) CALL SETUP OPTIMIZATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kodiak Networks, Inc.
2010 Crow Canyon Place Suite 270
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
[2013/23]
Inventor(s)01 / VEMPATI, Brahmananda, R.
18852 Haddington Lane
Dallas, TX 75287 / US
02 / PATEL, Krishnakant, M.
4613 Deer Valley Lane
Richardson, TX 75082 / US
03 / CHANDANA, Pratap
2232 Micarta Drive
Plano, TX 75025 / US
04 / NARAYANAN, Anand
5716 Gerber Terrace
Plano, TX 75094 / US
05 / AYYASAMY, Ravi
3301 North Star Road
517
Richardson, TX 75082 / US
06 / LAWLER, Bruce, D.
378 E. Meadows Drive
Kirkwood, CA 95646 / US
07 / KUMAR, Ravi Shankar
1800 East Spring Creek Pkwy
Apt 718
Plano, TX 75074 / US
08 / ARDAH, Basem, A
4624 Hinton Drive
Plano, TX 75024 / US
09 / KANDULA, Ramu
1438 3rd Cross
E Block
AECS Layout
Kundanahalli
Bangalore 560037 / IN
10 / KUNDU, Gorachand
Flat No. 3017
Maruthi Apartment
II Cross
Wind, Tunnel Road, Murugeshpalya, Karnataka
Bangalore 560017 / IN
11 / BISWAL, Bibhudatta
7220 McCallum Blvd
Apt. 1101
Dallas, TX 75252 / US
 [2013/23]
Representative(s)Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2013/23]
Application number, filing date11783919.125.04.2011
[2015/43]
WO2011US33791
Priority number, dateUS20100347217P21.05.2010         Original published format: US 347217 P
[2013/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011146205
Date:24.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2599326
Date:05.06.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011
[2013/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2599326
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.11.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/10, H04Q3/00, H04L29/06, H04W76/00
[2014/04]
Former International [2013/23]H04Q3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PRÄDIKTIVER AUFWECKORGANG FÜR POC-RUFVERBINDUNGSOPTIMIERUNG[2013/23]
English:PREDICTIVE WAKEUP FOR PUSH-TO-TALK-OVER-CELLULAR (POC) CALL SETUP OPTIMIZATIONS[2013/23]
French:RÉVEIL PRÉDICTIF POUR OPTIMISATIONS D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE COMMUNICATION DE MESSAGERIE VOCALE INSTANTANÉE (POC)[2013/23]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2013National basic fee paid 
08.04.2013Search fee paid 
08.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
08.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/23]
30.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2015Fee for grant paid
27.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2015
Opposition(s)22.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39]
Request for further processing for:08.04.2013Request for further processing filed
08.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.04.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
SI, IE, CZ, TR, SM, SK, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
08.04.2013Request for further processing filed
08.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.04.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
08.04.2013Request for further processing filed
08.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.04.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
08.04.2013Request for further processing filed
08.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.04.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
08.04.2013Request for further processing filed
08.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.04.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.04.2011
AL21.10.2015
AT21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU25.04.2011
AT21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
Former [2018/31]HU25.04.2011
AT21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
Former [2018/29]HU25.04.2011
AT21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2018/28]HU25.04.2011
AT21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/38]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/07]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
LU25.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/04]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
LU25.04.2016
Former [2016/49]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/38]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/34]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/23]HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/22]IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/21]IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
Former [2016/20]LT21.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2010048217  (KODIAK NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 13 * * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]WO2005112494  (KODIAK NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 3 * * claims 1-14 *;
 [A]US2006089167  (IDNANI AMIT [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * claims 1-30 *
International search[Y]US2003148779  (ARAVAMUDAN MURALI [US], et al);
 [Y]US2005261016  (PATEL KRISHNAKANT M [US], et al);
 [A]US2009325540  (YACH DAVID P [CA], et al);
 [A]US2006128411  (TURCANU CALIN [FI])