Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2622326

EP2622326 - METHOD FOR ACTIVATION OF AQUEOUS SILVER NANOPARTICLE DISPERSIONS FOR SURFACE ENHANCED RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
[2013/32]
Inventor(s)01 / PRUCEK, Robert
Olbramice 76
783 22 Olbramice / CZ
02 / KVITEK, Libor
Na Vystavisti 542
783 72 Velky Tynec / CZ
03 / PANACEK, Ales
Stromoradi 479
783 91 Unicov / CZ
04 / RANC, Vaclav
Dolany 214
783 16 Dolany / CZ
05 / ZBORIL, Radek
J. Glazarové 354/9D
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
 [2013/32]
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina
HARBER IP s.r.o.
Dukelskych hrdinu 567/52
170 00 Praha 7 / CZ
[N/P]
Former [2013/32]Hartvichova, Katerina
Inventia s.r.o.
Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
Application number, filing date11784577.629.08.2011
WO2011CZ00083
Priority number, dateCZ2010000070829.09.2010         Original published format: CZ 20100708
[2013/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012041262
Date:05.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2622326
Date:07.08.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012
[2013/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2622326
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/65, G01N33/58, G01N33/543, B82Y15/00, B82Y30/00
[2013/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AKTIVIERUNG VON WÄSSRIGEN SILBERNANOPARTIKELDISPERSIONEN FÜR OBERFLÄCHENVERSTÄRKTE RAMAN-SPEKTROSKOPIE[2013/32]
English:METHOD FOR ACTIVATION OF AQUEOUS SILVER NANOPARTICLE DISPERSIONS FOR SURFACE ENHANCED RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY[2013/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ACTIVATION DE DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DE NANOPARTICULES D'ARGENT DANS LA SPECTROSCOPIE RAMAN EXALTÉE DE SURFACE[2013/32]
Entry into regional phase02.04.2013National basic fee paid 
02.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/32]
11.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2014Fee for grant paid
18.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.06.2014
Opposition(s)04.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.08.2011
AL30.07.2014
AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MK30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU29.08.2011
AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MK30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2017/46]HU29.08.2011
AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/33]HU29.08.2011
AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU29.08.2011
AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/28]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/22]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/51]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/20]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/19]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RS30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT30.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]  - KVITEK L ET AL, "The influence of complexing agent concentration on particle size in the process of SERS active silver colloid synthesis", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY R. SOC. CHEM. UK, (20050314), vol. 15, no. 10, ISSN 0959-9428, pages 1099 - 1105, XP055015704 [X] 1,3-5 * page 1100, column 2, paragraph l - page 1101, column 2, line 2; table 1 * * page 1103, column 2, paragraph l - page 1104, column 2, line l; figures 8,9 * [Y] 2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B417007E
 [X]  - N.R. JANA ET AL, "Anisotropic Metal Nanoparticles for Use as Surface-Enhanced Raman Substrates", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (20070702), vol. 19, no. 13, doi:10.1002/adma.200601749, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 1761 - 1765, XP055015806 [X] 1,5 * page 1761, column 2, line 7 - page 1762, column 1, line 13; figures 1,2 * * page 1763, column 1, line 1 - line 12 * * page 1765, column 1, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200601749
 [YA]  - KEN-TYE YONG ET AL, "Templated Synthesis of Gold Nanorods (NRs): The Effects of Cosurfactants and Electrolytes on the Shape and Optical Properties", TOPICS IN CATALYSIS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20080206), vol. 47, no. 1-2, ISSN 1572-9028, pages 49 - 60, XP019581515 [Y] 2 * paragraph [006.]; figures 7,8 * [A] 1,3-5
 [A]  - JANINA KNEIPP ET AL, "Surface-enhanced Raman scattering: a new optical probe in molecular biophysics and biomedicine", THEORETICAL CHEMISTRY ACCOUNTS ; THEORY, COMPUTATION, AND MODELING, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20091113), vol. 125, no. 3-6, ISSN 1432-2234, pages 319 - 327, XP019777551 [A] 1-5 * page 322, column 2, line 4 - line 23; figure 3 *
 [XP]  - PRUCEK R ET AL, "Re-crystallization of silver nanoparticles in a highly concentrated NaCl environment -a new substrate for surface enhanced IR-visible Raman spectroscopy", CRYSTENGCOMM, online, (20110121), vol. 13, pages 2242 - 2248, XP009154348 [XP] 1-5 * page 2242, column 2, paragraph l - page 2247, column 1, line 19; figures 1-6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C0CE00776E