blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2622326 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2622326



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 202
03.06.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.06.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.06.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.06.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
09.05.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.02.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 3
10.01.2014 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
17.07.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.07.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.05.2013 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.05.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 11
09.04.2013 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
03.04.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
08.02.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.09.2012 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 11
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.09.2012 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.09.2012 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.09.2012 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.06.2012 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
21.06.2012 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.05.2012 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
18.05.2012 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2012 Abstract PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2012 Abstract PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2012 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2012 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
03.05.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.05.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
03.05.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
25.04.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
05.04.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.04.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 19
17.01.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
17.01.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.01.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
04.11.2011 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.11.2011 Claims International Searching Authority 1
04.11.2011 Description International Searching Authority 11
04.11.2011 Drawings International Searching Authority 6