blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2622326


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
08.07.2016 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
13.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
05.06.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
10.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
05.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
19.09.2014 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2014 (Expected) grant published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
25.06.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.06.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.06.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.06.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.06.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.12.2013 Change - extension states published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
26.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.07.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.08.2013  [2013/32]
05.07.2013 Request for examination filed published on  07.08.2013  [2013/32]
04.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
13.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
16.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
29.11.2011 PCT data prior to European publication