blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2622326
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2622326 30.07.2014B1
EP2622326 07.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011CZ00083 29.08.2011
CZ2010708 29.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ304231 15.01.2014B6
CZ2010708 11.04.2012A3
Priority number Date
CZ2010708 29.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012041262 05.04.2012A1
Priority number Date
CZ2010708 29.09.2010