Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2643498

EP2643498 - COATED CUTTING TOOL INSERT FOR METAL MACHINING THAT GENERATES HIGH TEMPERATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/40]COATED CUTTING TOOL INSERT
[2018/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seco Tools AB
737 82 Fagersta / SE
[2013/40]
Inventor(s)01 / LIND, Hans
Alsättersgatan 13b20
584 35 Linköping / SE
02 / FORSÉN, Rikard
Lövsångarev. 21
S-585 65 Linghem / SE
03 / JOHANSSON, Mats
Olaigatan 30
703 61 Örebro / SE
04 / TASNADI, Ferenc
Lantmannagatan 145
583 32 Linköping / SE
05 / GHAFOOR, Naureen
Fanjunkaregatan 139
582 16 Linköping / SE
06 / ALLING, Björn
Storgården 7
586 44 Linköping / SE
07 / ODÉN, Magnus
Örnbergsvägen 52 B
146 40 Tullinge / SE
08 / ABRIKOSSOV, Igor
Trumslagaregatan 95
582 16 Linköping / SE
 [2018/41]
Former [2013/40]01 / LIND, Hans
Alsättersgatan 13b20
S-584 35 Linköping / SE
02 / FORSÉN, Rikard
Lövsångarev. 21
S-585 65 Linghem / SE
03 / JOHANSSON, Mats
Olaigatan 30
S-703 61 Örebro / SE
04 / TASNADI, Ferenc
Lantmannagatan 145
S-583 32 Linköping / SE
05 / GHAFOOR, Naureen
Fanjunkaregatan 139
S-582 16 Linköping / SE
06 / ALLING, Björn
Storgården 7
S-586 44 Linköping / SE
07 / ODÉN, Magnus
Örnbergsvägen 52 B
S-146 40 Tullinge / SE
08 / ABRIKOSSOV, Igor
Trumslagaregatan 95
S-582 16 Linköping / SE
Representative(s)Sandvik
Sandvik Intellectual Property AB
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[2018/41]
Former [2013/40]Klöfver, Jörgen , et al
Sandvik Intellectual Property AB
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Application number, filing date11784719.422.11.2011
[2018/41]
WO2011EP70685
Priority number, dateEP2010019223523.11.2010         Original published format: EP 10192235
[2013/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012069475
Date:31.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2643498
Date:02.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012
[2013/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2643498
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:C23C30/00, C23C28/00, C23C14/06, B23B27/14
[2018/24]
Former International [2018/23]C23C14/00, C23C14/32
Former International [2013/40]C23C28/00, C23C30/00, B23B27/14, C23C14/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTETER SCHNEIDEEINSATZ FÜR METALLBEARBEITUNG, DER HOHE TEMPERATUREN BEWIRKT[2018/25]
English:COATED CUTTING TOOL INSERT FOR METAL MACHINING THAT GENERATES HIGH TEMPERATURES[2018/23]
French:INSERT D'OUTILS DE COUPE REVETUS POUR MACHINAGE METALLIQUE QUI PRODUIT DES HAUTES TEMPERATURES[2018/24]
Former [2013/40]SCHNEIDEWERKZEUGEINSATZ
Former [2013/40]COATED CUTTING TOOL INSERT
Former [2013/40]INSERT D'OUTIL DE COUPE REVÊTU
Entry into regional phase24.06.2013National basic fee paid 
24.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/40]
22.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2018Fee for grant paid
27.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2017
Opposition(s)11.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SI10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
IE22.11.2018
LU22.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
IE22.11.2018
LU22.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/40]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL10.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2003124391  (VETTER JORG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-10,13,14 * page 3, paragraph 41 - paragraph 54 * * page 4, paragraph 64 - paragraph 73; claims 1-7,10; table 1 * [A] 2,5,12 [I] 11;
 [XAI]EP1132498  (METAPLAS IONON GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-10,14 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 19 * * claims 1-4,8-12 * * page 7, paragraph 22 - page 8, paragraph 29 * [A] 2,4,13 [I] 11,12;
 [IA]JP2008264971  (NISSHIN KOGU KK) [I] 1,3-5,7-9,13,14 *reference is made to the following passages from the automatic text translated version from PAJ* * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; tables 1-2 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0031] - [0034] * [A] 2,6,10,11;
 [IA]US2006222891  (WEBER FRANK-R [DE]) [I] 1-6,9-14 * page 1, paragraph 10 - paragraph 24 * * page 2, paragraph 32 - page 3, paragraph 53 * [A] 7,8;
 [A]US2004237840  (YAMAMOTO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 4, paragraph 79 * * page 5, paragraph 84 - paragraph 90 * * page 7, paragraph 106 - paragraph 111 * * page 8, paragraph 131 - page 9, paragraph 135 *
by applicantJPH07237010
 JPH04128363
 JP2000038653
 EP1219723
 EP1132498
 EP1947209