Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2640296

EP2640296 - ELECTROSURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GYRUS MEDICAL LIMITED
Fortran Road, St. Mellons
Cardiff CF3 0LT / GB
[2013/39]
Inventor(s)01 / JENKINS, Andrew Edward
61 Ton Row
Ton Pentre
Pentre
Rhondda Cynon Taff CF41 7AW / GB
02 / BRIGGS, Kerry Simpson
3 Pen Y Wain Place
Cardiff CF24 4GA / GB
03 / WARREN, Philip John
7 Adare Terrace
Treorchy
Rhondda Cynon Taff CF42 6EN / GB
 [2013/39]
Representative(s)Wallin, Nicholas James , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2013/39]
Application number, filing date11784743.410.11.2011
[2017/01]
WO2011GB01590
Priority number, dateGB2010001955419.11.2010         Original published format: GB 201019554
[2013/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012066276
Date:24.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2640296
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012
[2013/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2640296
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14
[2013/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT[2013/39]
English:ELECTROSURGICAL INSTRUMENT[2013/39]
French:INSTRUMENT ÉLECTROCHIRURGICAL[2013/39]
Entry into regional phase08.05.2013National basic fee paid 
08.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/39]
19.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.04.2016
14.04.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2016Fee for grant paid
30.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.02.2014
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
[2017/51]
Former [2017/49]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0467501  (EVEREST MEDICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12,14-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - column 6, line 37 * [Y] 3,6,11,13;
 [Y]DE19938902  (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,11 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP1864623  (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [Y] 6,13 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007198011  (SUGITA NORIYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5078716  (DOLL LARRY F [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4493320
 US4905691
 US5078716
 EP0047501