Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2632684

EP2632684 - CLOSING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KraussMaffei Technologies GmbH
Krauss-Maffei Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
[2013/36]
Inventor(s)01 / HÖRNLA, Robert
Abt-Rottenkolber-Str. 16
85253 Kleinberghofen / DE
 [2013/38]
Former [2013/36]01 / HÖRNLA, Robert
Ulmenstrasse 2
85247 Schwabhausen / DE
Representative(s)Wilhelm, Ludwig , et al
KraussMaffei Group GmbH
Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
[2013/36]
Application number, filing date11784960.426.10.2011
[2017/11]
WO2011EP68804
Priority number, dateDE2010104997028.10.2010         Original published format: DE102010049970
[2013/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012055939
Date:03.05.2012
Language:DE
[2012/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2632684
Date:04.09.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012
[2013/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2632684
Date:15.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/67, B29C45/17
[2013/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHLIESSEINHEIT[2013/36]
English:CLOSING UNIT[2013/36]
French:UNITÉ DE FERMETURE[2013/36]
Entry into regional phase28.05.2013National basic fee paid 
28.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.08.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/36]
20.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2017Fee for grant paid
27.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.10.2016
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
MT15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
GB26.10.2017
IE26.10.2017
LU26.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
MT15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
GB26.10.2017
LU26.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/37]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
GB26.10.2017
LU26.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/36]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
GB26.10.2017
LU26.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/35]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
GB26.10.2017
LU26.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/29]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005025856  (NISHINO SATOHARU [JP]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraphs 20, 28 - pages 1,2,4; figure 1 *;
 [X]JPH06297526  (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract *;
 [A]US5135385  (FUKUZAWA SHIGEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 2; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]JP2009051090  (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
by applicantEP1343975
 DE20006618U
 US6231329
 DE2455702
 EP0942821
 DE102005003566