Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2640581

EP2640581 - MULTILAYER DECORATIVE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.07.2016
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covestro Deutschland AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2015/45]
Former [2013/39]For all designated states
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Str. 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
Inventor(s)01 / OHWADA, Takahiko
8-17 Bishoen 1-chome
Abendo-ku
Osaka-city Osaka 545-0003 / JP
02 / BÜCHNER, Jörg
Im Plackenbruch 41
51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
03 / MUNDSTOCK, Holger
Lortzingstr. 11
42929 Wermelskirchen / DE
 [2013/39]
Representative(s)Levpat
c/o Covestro AG
Gebäude 4825
51365 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/39]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Application number, filing date11785383.815.11.2011
WO2011EP70098
Priority number, dateJP2010025912219.11.2010         Original published format: JP 2010259122
[2013/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012065966
Date:24.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2640581
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012
[2013/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:B44C1/10, B29C51/14, B29C51/16, C09J5/06, C09J7/02
[2013/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/39]
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTIGE DEKORATIVE FOLIE[2013/39]
English:MULTILAYER DECORATIVE FILM[2013/39]
French:FILM DÉCORATIF MULTICOUCHE[2013/39]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2013National basic fee paid 
19.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/39]
19.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/32]
06.07.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2016
10.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US5286528  (REAFLER GERALD G [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 30 - column 12, line 38 * * figure 2 * [Y] 6-15 [I] 3,5;
 [XY]US2003077420  (BRODIL JASON C [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7-15;
 [Y]US2002022680  (GUSE DIETER [DE], et al) [Y] 7-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0067] *;
 [Y]US4543393  (BLUM RAINER [DE], et al) [Y] 7-15 * the whole document *;
 [YA]EP1547764  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 2,7A-C * [A] 1-5,7-15;
 [A]US5132148  (REAFLER GERALD G [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1658905  (DEMAXZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantJP3937231B
 JP2000079796
 JPH1058895
 JP4130583B
 EP0922720
 EP1448735
 EP1541649
 WO2005080484
 WO2005099943
 WO2005118689
 WO2006048109
 WO2008052665
 DE102006058527
    - Library of decoration for plastics, TECHNICAL INFORMATION INSTITUTE CO., LTD., (2008), pages 219 - 228
    - Latest trend of decoration technology for plastics, CMC PUBLISHING CO., LTD., (2010), pages 151 - 157