Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2651681

EP2651681 - HYBRID DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019 [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2017/43]
Former [2013/43]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FUNK, Kilian
234 Rock Road
Greer, South Carolina 29651-0000 / US
02 / SCHLICHTE, Dirk
Dreimuehlenstr. 4
80469 Muenchen / DE
03 / FOERG, Martin
Schleißheimerstr. 26c
85748 Garching / DE
04 / DAUN, Nico
Gassner Straße 18
80639 München / DE
05 / OTTE, Alexander-Wilhelm
Hohenwarter Str. 6
82281 Wenigmünchen / DE
06 / URBANEK, Matthias
Waldwinkel 20
28816 Suhr / DE
07 / HOESS, Bernhard
Schwertlilienweg 7
80995 München / DE
08 / NEUMANN, Lutz
Reiner-Klinke-Str. 11
85375 Neufahrn / DE
 [2013/43]
Application number, filing date11785609.619.11.2011
[2017/43]
WO2011EP05843
Priority number, dateDE2010106309215.12.2010         Original published format: DE102010063092
[2013/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012079683
Date:21.06.2012
Language:DE
[2012/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2651681
Date:23.10.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012
[2013/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2651681
Date:25.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60K6/36, B60K6/547, F16H3/00, B60W20/10, B60K6/48
[2017/24]
Former International [2013/43]B60K6/48
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYBRIDANTRIEB[2013/43]
English:HYBRID DRIVE[2013/43]
French:MOTORISATION HYBRIDE[2013/43]
Entry into regional phase02.04.2013National basic fee paid 
02.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
08.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2017Fee for grant paid
11.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2017
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
04.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/50]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/45]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/43]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
LU19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
LU19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/38]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
LU19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/36]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL25.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XPLI]EP2368739  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-12 * the whole document * [L] 13,14 [I] ;
 [X]US2010311540  (HELLENBROICH GEREON [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,9-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19960621  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE10133695  (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-14 * abstract *
ExaminationWO2010070707