Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2633152 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2633152



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1297
21.01.2019 Refund of fees Appeal 1
18.01.2019 Refund of fees Appeal 1
15.01.2019 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
15.01.2019 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
15.01.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
10.01.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
09.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.01.2019 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
21.11.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.11.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
15.11.2018 Request for acceleration of appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.11.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 40
25.09.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.09.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.09.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.09.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.07.2018 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
12.07.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
05.07.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
05.07.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
05.07.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.06.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.05.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
16.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.05.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.05.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
16.05.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
16.05.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 13
06.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.04.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.04.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.04.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
05.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 29
12.03.2018 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
06.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
20.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.11.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
07.11.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.11.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.11.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
27.09.2017 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.09.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
27.09.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 29
17.05.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.05.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
21.04.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.04.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.04.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
05.04.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
05.04.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
05.04.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.04.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.04.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.04.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
05.04.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 37
05.04.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
05.04.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
05.04.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
05.04.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.04.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
05.04.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
05.04.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
05.04.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.08.2016 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
17.08.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
06.07.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.06.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
25.05.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
25.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.05.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.05.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.05.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.05.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
24.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.03.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 19
24.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
24.03.2016 Description Search / examination 19
24.03.2016 Drawings Search / examination 7
24.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
02.12.2015 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
26.08.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
26.08.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.08.2015 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
19.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.08.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.08.2015 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
17.08.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
21.04.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
21.04.2015 Description Search / examination 21
21.04.2015 Drawings Search / examination 8
21.04.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.04.2015 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
16.04.2015 Description Search / examination 20
16.04.2015 Drawings Search / examination 8
16.04.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.12.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.12.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.12.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.12.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.12.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.12.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
30.12.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
30.12.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
30.12.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
30.12.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 7
23.12.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
23.12.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.12.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
23.12.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
23.12.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
23.12.2013 Drawings Search / examination 7
07.08.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.06.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.05.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.05.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 2
31.05.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
27.05.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 2
27.05.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
14.05.2013 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
14.05.2013 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 1
14.05.2013 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
20.03.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.01.2013 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
24.01.2013 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.01.2013 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.01.2013 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
24.01.2013 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
24.01.2013 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.01.2013 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.01.2013 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.01.2013 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.01.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
02.01.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
02.01.2013 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.12.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
28.12.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
28.12.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
28.12.2012 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.12.2012 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
31.10.2012 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
31.10.2012 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
31.10.2012 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.10.2012 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
05.10.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
05.10.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
02.10.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
02.10.2012 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
27.09.2012 Invitation to submit amendments (PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.09.2012 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
03.09.2012 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
31.08.2012 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
31.08.2012 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.08.2012 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.08.2012 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
24.05.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
24.05.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
03.05.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
03.05.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
09.01.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
09.01.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
09.01.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
21.12.2011 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
13.12.2011 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
15.11.2011 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
15.11.2011 Claims International Searching Authority 6
15.11.2011 Description International Searching Authority 17
15.11.2011 Drawings International Searching Authority 7