Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2640575

EP2640575 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO INKJET PRINTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Domino Printing Sciences PLC
Trafalgar Way
Bar Hill
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB23 8TU / GB
[2013/39]
Inventor(s)01 / WALKINGTON, Stuart Mark
72 Westfields
St Albans
Hertfordshire AL3 4LZ / GB
02 / GUINEE, Brian Patrick
33 Avenue Road
St Neots
Cambridgeshire PE19 1LJ / GB
 [2013/39]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/37]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2013/39]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date11788215.921.11.2011
[2015/37]
WO2011GB52273
Priority number, dateGB2010001968819.11.2010         Original published format: GB 201019688
GB2010001968519.11.2010         Original published format: GB 201019685
[2013/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012066354
Date:24.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2640575
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012
[2013/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2640575
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[2013/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKERN[2013/39]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO INKJET PRINTERS[2013/39]
French:PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTÉS À DES IMPRIMANTES À JET D'ENCRE OU S'Y RAPPORTANT[2013/39]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2013National basic fee paid 
22.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/39]
07.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2015Fee for grant paid
28.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.03.2015
Opposition(s)10.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.11.2011
AL09.09.2015
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
MK09.09.2015
MT09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
SM09.09.2015
TR09.09.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/31]HU21.11.2011
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
MK09.09.2015
MT09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
SM09.09.2015
TR09.09.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2017/39]HU21.11.2011
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
MT09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
SM09.09.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/45]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/39]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/36]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/34]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/31]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
LU21.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/28]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/24]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
Former [2016/14]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT09.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2009049146  (VIDEOJET TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 16, paragraphs 2, 3; figures 11- 13 *;
 [X]US2002024571  (CHILDERS WINTHROP D [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0053] , [0 55] , [ 97]; figures 2,3,9,10a,20 *;
 [X]EP2080620  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0054]; figure 3 *;
 [X]US2006203045  (KOBAYASHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0109] , [ 116] , [ 187]; figures 9, 10 *;
 [X]WO2009089567  (SILVERBROOK RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 70, lines 10-15; figure 2b * * page 72, line 5 - page 73, line 17; figures 7, 8 *;
 [X]US2004100539  (UJITA TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0047]; figure 1 *
by applicantWO2009049146