Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2577551

EP2577551 - IDENTITY MANAGEMENT VIA CLOUD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
For all designated states
Nair, Jiji
2407 South Park Lane
Santa Clara, California 95051 / US
For all designated states
Welingkar, Bharat
878 Riverside Drive
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
[2014/13]
Former [2013/15]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
For all designated states
Nair, Jiji
2407 South Park Lane
Santa Clara, California 95051 / US
For all designated states
Welingkar, Bharat
878 Riverside Drive
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NAIR, Jiji
2407 South Park Lane
Santa Clara, California 95051 / US
02 / WELINGKAR, Bharat
878 Riverside Drive
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
 [2013/15]
Representative(s)Potter, Julian Mark
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Potter, Julian Mark
WP Thompson
55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date11790244.527.05.2011
WO2011US38349
Priority number, dateUS2010086951626.08.2010         Original published format: US 869516
US20100351229P03.06.2010         Original published format: US 351229 P
[2013/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011153092
Date:08.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2577551
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011
[2013/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/20, G06F21/24, H04L9/32, G06F15/16
[2013/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/15]
TitleGerman:IDENTITÄTSMANAGEMENT DURCH EINE CLOUD[2013/15]
English:IDENTITY MANAGEMENT VIA CLOUD[2013/15]
French:GESTION D'IDENTITÉ PAR NUAGE[2013/15]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2012National basic fee paid 
12.12.2012Search fee paid 
12.12.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/15]
22.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
07.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008040782  (LAURSEN ANDREW L [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0055]; figures 2-5 *;
 [I]US2007115940  (KAMEN VLADIMIR [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 3,4; claims 1-9 *
International search[A]US2005239447  (HOLZMAN ARON M [US], et al);
 [A]US2008091613  (GATES WILLIAM H [US], et al);
 [A]US2008083025  (MEIJER HENRICUS JOHANNES MARIA [US], et al);
 [A]US2008080718  (MEIJER HENRICUS JOHANNES MARIA [US], et al)