Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2012056049

WO2012056049 - READER AS AN ELECTRONIC IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2013
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.11.2013  [2013/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technische Universität Darmstadt
Karolinenplatz 5
64285 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / WIESMAIER, Alexander
Fabrikweg 5
63924 Kleinheubach / DE
02 / HORSCH, Moritz
Saalbaustr. 5
64283 Darmstadt / DE
03 / HÜHNLEIN, Detlef
Sudetenstr. 16
96247 Michelau / DE
04 / BRAUN, Johannes
Im Boden 30
64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date11790892.131.10.2011
WO2011EP69175
Priority number, dateDE2010105019504.11.2010         Original published format: DE102010050195
DE2010104973931.10.2010         Original published format: DE102010049739
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012056049
Date:03.05.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012
[2012/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, G06F21/00, G07F9/00, H04L9/32, G06Q20/00, H04M1/725
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LESEGERÄT ALS ELEKTRONISCHER AUSWEIS
English:READER AS AN ELECTRONIC IDENTIFICATION
French:APPAREIL DE LECTURE SERVANT D'IDENTIFIANT ÉLECTRONIQUE
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/48]
01.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/48]
09.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2013/48]
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE102008037793  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0104] * [I] 2-7;
 [XI]DE102008040416  (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0012] - [0014] , [0015] , [0019] , [0027] , [0034] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0082] * [I] 2-7;
 [XI]US2006136717  (BUER MARK [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0110] * [I] 2-7;
 [A]DE10212619  (UBS AG ZUERICH [CH]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007143828  (JEAL DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102005043053
 DE102009001959